San Diego Coastkeeper et al v. Hanson Aggregates Pacific Southwest, Inc.
Plaintiff: San Diego Coastkeeper and Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation
Defendant: Hanson Aggregates Pacific Southwest, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00565
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1251
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Commencement of 45-Day Review Period by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation (Beaudin, Livia) (anh).
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beaudin, Livia) (anh).
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation, as to Hanson Aggregates Pacific Southwest, Inc.. (Beaudin, Livia) (anh).
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv0565-CAB-WVG.(no document attached) (anh)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew John O'Malley on behalf of San Diego Coastkeeper (O'Malley, Matthew)Attorney Matthew John O'Malley added to party San Diego Coastkeeper(pty:pla)(aef).
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao).
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hanson Aggregates Pacific Southwest, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12347127.), filed by San Diego Coastkeeper, Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-565-BEN-WVG. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Beaudin, Livia)(jrm) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Diego Coastkeeper et al v. Hanson Aggregates Pacific Southwest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Coastkeeper
Represented By: Matthew John O'Malley
Represented By: Livia Borak Beaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation
Represented By: Livia Borak Beaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Aggregates Pacific Southwest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?