Wimbs v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Wimbs
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive, Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. and Does 1 though 25
Case Number: 3:2019cv00581
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting the Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order With Modification [ECF No. #13 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/8/2019. (anh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION Entry of Stipulated Protective Order by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Holt, Christopher) QC mailer re: proposed order attached (tcf).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 12/2/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/11/2019.(anh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 6/10/2019. Case did not settle. Case Management Conference held on 6/10/2019. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Richard Thomas; Robert Hodges). (Defendant Attorney Christopher Holt). (no document attached) (bxr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Holt, Christopher) (anh).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting In Part the Parties' Joint Motion to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference [ECF No. #8 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/25/2019. (anh)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue ENE by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Holt, Christopher) (anh).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/9/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 4/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/5/2019.(anh)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Parent Corporation by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (mme) (jao)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. Added Mardel, Inc. as Other Affiliate . (mme) Modified on 4/2/2019 (jao).
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (mme) (jao).
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (mme) (jao).
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (mme) (jao).
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of CA, San Diego, case number 37-2018-00053418-CU-PO-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12355022.), filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint), #3 Exhibit 2 (Statement of Damages), #4 Exhibit 3 (Answer to State Court Complaint))The new case number is 3:19-cv-581-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(mme) (jao). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2019: #5 Proof of Service) (mme). Modified on 4/2/2019 to attach proof of service (mme).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wimbs v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Wimbs
Represented By: Richard F. G. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 though 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?