Cason v. Williams

Petitioner: Michael Barrett Cason
Respondent: Louis Williams
Case Number: 3:2019cv00662
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Barrett Cason. Previously documents mailed to new address.(jms)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (tcf)(jrd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis,. Mail sent to Michael Barrett Cason. (jms)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Mail sent to Michael Barret Cason. Document was re-mailed to the updated mailing address. (ag)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Barrett Cason. Previously documents mailed to new address. (jms)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. Mail sent to Michael Barrett Cason. (jms)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION AND DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE RE #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/10/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm) (jao).
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Barrett Cason. (jms) (jao).
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Louis Williams, filed by Michael Barrett Cason.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-662-WQH-JLB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jms) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cason v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Barrett Cason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Louis Williams
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?