Womack v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Melinda Womack
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00682
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC Only by Melinda Womack (Tran, Vivian) (aef).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Equifax shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/6/2019. (aef)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas)Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) (aef).
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melinda Womack. Equifax Information Services, LLC served. (Tran, Vivian) (tcf).
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao).
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12403135.), filed by Melinda Womack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-682-DMS-JLB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Tran, Vivian)(jrm) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Womack v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Womack
Represented By: Vivian Xuan Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?