Estrada v. Sullivan et al

Petitioner: Joey M. Estrada
Respondent: W. Sullivan and Xavier Bicerra
Case Number: 3:2019cv00693
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Questions and Exhibits, from Petitioner Joey M. Estrada. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Case closed as successive petition per Order dated 4/23/2019 (ECF No. #3 ), Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/30/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Attached with Exhibit A, from Petitioner Joey M. Estrada. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Case closed as successive petition per Order dated 4/23/2019 (ECF No. #3 ), Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/29/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice to Petitioner filing a petition in this court if he obtains the necessary order from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. For Petitioner's convenience, the Clerk of Court shall attach a blank Ninth Circuit Application for Leave to File Second or Successive Petition. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (jao).
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summary of Dismissal of Successive Petition. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/23/19.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service & a blank Ninth Circuit Application for Leave to File Second or Successive Petition)(dlg) (jao).
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joey M. Estrada. (jms)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Xavier Bicerra, W. Sullivan, filed by Joey M. Estrada.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-693-GPC-AGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(jms) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joey M. Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W. Sullivan
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Xavier Bicerra
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?