13th and Market Properties LLC v. Magee et al

Plaintiff: 13th and Market Properties LLC
Defendant: Tony Magee and DOES 1-25
Case Number: 3:2019cv00694
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441tl
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Because Defendant cannot establish federal jurisdiction, removal was improper. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to remand, (Doc. No. 3), and REMANDS the case back to the San Diego Superior Court. The Court Clerk is ordered to then close the case (Certified copy sent to State Court via US Mail Service.) Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/7/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)(jrd)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Responses due by 5/17/2019; Replies due by 5/24/2019; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 7/11/19 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by 13th and Market Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - 1 Notices, #2 Exhibit Exhibit - 2 Unlawful Detainer Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit - 3 Request for Entry of Default, #4 Exhibit Exhibit - 4 Judgment for Possession, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Issued Writ of Possession)(Brisco, Todd) (acc).
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Magee. (mme) (jao). (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/24/2019) (jao).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, San Diego, case number 37-2019-0001458-CL-UD-CTL., IFP Filed, filed by Tony Magee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit including State Court documents)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00694-AJB-MDD. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 13th and Market Properties LLC v. Magee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 13th and Market Properties LLC
Represented By: Todd Anthony Brisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?