San Diego Coastkeeper et al v. Rohr, Inc.
Plaintiff: San Diego Coastkeeper and Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation
Defendant: Rohr, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00777
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1251
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rohr, Inc. (Robinson, Geoffrey) (tcf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Rachael Rutkowski by Geoffrey Laurence Robinson on behalf of Rohr, Inc. (Robinson, Geoffrey) QC mailer sent re: wrong signature and/or CM/ECF attorney account used (tcf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Laurence Robinson on behalf of Rohr, Inc. (Robinson, Geoffrey)Attorney Geoffrey Laurence Robinson added to party Rohr, Inc.(pty:dft) (tcf).
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation, as to Rohr, Inc.. (Beaudin, Livia) (ag).
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew John O'Malley on behalf of San Diego Coastkeeper (O'Malley, Matthew)Attorney Matthew John O'Malley added to party San Diego Coastkeeper(pty:pla) (ag).
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rohr, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12451741), filed by San Diego Coastkeeper, Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00777-WQH-BLM. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Beaudin, Livia)(cdw) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Diego Coastkeeper et al v. Rohr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Coastkeeper
Represented By: Livia Borak Beaudin
Represented By: Matthew John O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coastal Environmental Rights Foundation
Represented By: Livia Borak Beaudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohr, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey Laurence Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?