Basile v. Jenny Craig, Inc.

Plaintiff: Taylor Basile
Defendant: Jenny Craig, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00788
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/6/2019. (jdt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Taylor Basile without prejudice (Ahdoot, Robert) (jdt).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Docket no. #4 ). Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 6/12/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/17/2019. (jdt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Z. Petersen on behalf of Jenny Craig, Inc. (Petersen, Shannon)Attorney Shannon Z. Petersen added to party Jenny Craig, Inc.(pty:dft) (jdt).
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Jenny Craig, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Craig Holdings, Inc. for Jenny Craig, Inc.. (Yun, Lisa) (jdt). (jao).
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jenny Craig, Inc.. (Yun, Lisa)Attorney Lisa S. Yun added to party Jenny Craig, Inc.(pty:dft) Modified (jdt).
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Basile. Jenny Craig, Inc. served. (Ahdoot, Robert) (jdt).
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jenny Craig, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12458861), filed by Taylor Basile. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00788-LAB-BGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Ahdoot, Robert)(cdw) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basile v. Jenny Craig, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Basile
Represented By: Robert R. Ahdoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Craig, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa S. Yun
Represented By: Shannon Z. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?