Dakin v. BMW of North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Alex Dakin
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00818
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Third Joint #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint. BMW NA must file an initial response by July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/2/19. (dlg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by BMW of North America, LLC. (Luu, Betty) (dlg).
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BMW of North America, LLC, filed by Alex Dakin. (Hussin, Tammy) (dlg).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Joint #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to June 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/12/19. (dlg)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by BMW of North America, LLC. (Luu, Betty)Attorney Betty Luu added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Joint #4 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint to June 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/4/19. (dlg)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by BMW of North America, LLC. (Chan, Garrick)Attorney Garrick Y. Chan added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Dakin. BMW of North America, LLC served. (Hussin, Tammy) (dlg).
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao).
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BMW of North America, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12471456), filed by Alex Dakin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00818-GPC-BGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Hussin, Tammy)(cdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dakin v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Dakin
Represented By: Tammy Gruder Hussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Garrick Y. Chan
Represented By: Betty Luu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?