Chatman v. Hussien

Plaintiff: Eric Chatman
Defendant: Saddam Hussien
Case Number: 3:2019cv00859
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 2nd Letter to Judges by Eric Chatman. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/6/2019.(jms)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: 2d Letter to Judge, from Plaintiff Eric Chatman. Non-compliance with local rule(s) Civ.L.Rule 83.9 Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters to the judge. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/6/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/6/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eric Chatman. (jms)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Letter by Eric Chatman. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/4/2019.(jms)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: Letter, from Plaintiff Eric Chatman. Non-compliance with local rule(s) Civ.L.Rule 83.9 Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters to the judge. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/4/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/6/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Chatman. (jms)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Saddam Hussien, filed by Eric Chatman.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-859-LAB-KSC. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatman v. Hussien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saddam Hussien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?