Stark v. Thibault
Plaintiff: Collette Stark
Defendant: Dennis Thibault
Case Number: 3:2019cv00864
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/6/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 7/2/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dennis Thibault.(Kaminski, David)Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Dennis Thibault(pty:dft) (acc).
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Collette Stark. Dennis Thibault served. (rmc)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-CV-00864-AJB-RBB.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (als)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (als)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Dennis Thibault ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS111617.), filed by Collette Stark.The new case number is 3:19-cv-00864-MMA-RBB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Stark, Collette)(als) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (als).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stark v. Thibault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Thibault
Represented By: David J Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collette Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?