Hood v. Director of the California Department of Corrections et al

Petitioner: Daniel Roger Hood
Respondent: Director of the California Department of Corrections, . and Vincent P. LaPietra
Case Number: 3:2019cv00882
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on Petitioner's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Successive Petition. If Petitioner is seeking 30-day continuance of the 6/13/2019 deadline for filing authorization to file successive petition, Petitioner's motion is granted. Petitioner must file with this Court by 7/15/2019, the order from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals authorizing him to file a successive petition and Petitioner must ask Court to reopen this case. If Petitioner is seeking an extension of time to thoroughly prepare a successive petition with exhibits for the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, Petitioner's request of denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/18/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Fee for Habeas Petition: Paid on 6/10/2019. Added document on 6/10/2019. NEF regenerated (tcf).
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Daniel Roger Hood. (jms)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying as moot Petitioner's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because there is no indication Petitioner has obtained permission from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals to file a successive petition, this Court cannot consider his petition. Court dismisses this action without prejudice to Petitioner filing a petition in this Court if he obtains the necessary order from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. If Petitioner has already been granted permission from the Ninth Circuit, Petitioner may present the authorization by 6/13/2019, and request to have the case reopened. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/13/2019. (Blank Application for Leave to File Second or Successive Petition t/w copy of this order mailed to Petitioner) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (dsn)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Roger Hood. (jms) (jao).
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Director of the California Department of Corrections, Vincent P. LaPietra, filed by Daniel Roger Hood.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-882-H-BLM. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(jms) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood v. Director of the California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of the California Department of Corrections, .
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vincent P. LaPietra
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Roger Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?