Kennedy v. Client Services Inc.

Plaintiff: Edgar Kennedy
Defendant: Client Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00905
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Edgar Kennedy (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shay, Daniel). Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Edgar Kennedy (pty:pla). (jah).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/25/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Rule 26(f) conference shall completed by 9/27/2019. Joint Discovery Plan shall be filed in CM/ECF as well as lodged with Magistrate Judge Skomal by 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/2/2019. (jah)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Client Services Inc.. Identifying Corporate Parent CSI Interco LLC for Client Services Inc.. (Zugsay, Kathleen). (jah).
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Trial Demand to #1 Complaint by Client Services Inc..(Zugsay, Kathleen). Attorney Kathleen Zugsay added to party Client Services Inc. (pty:dft). Modified on 7/2/2019 - Added jury demand (jah).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edgar Kennedy. Client Services Inc. served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana). (jah).
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbas Kazerounian on behalf of Edgar Kennedy (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas. Attorney Abbas Kazerounian added to party Edgar Kennedy(pty:pla). Modified on 5/16/2019 - Removed extra added text (jah).
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Yana A. Hart on behalf of Edgar Kennedy (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana).Attorney Yana A. Hart added to party Edgar Kennedy (pty:pla). Modified on 5/16/2019 - Removed extra added text (jah).
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Client Services Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12508033.) filed by Edgar Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00905-H-BGS. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Swigart, Joshua)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Client Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Kennedy
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Client Services Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Zugsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?