(HC) Escobar v. People of Inglewood, CA

Case Number: 3:2019cv00912
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt assigned to transfer case from Eastern District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00366. Original file received electronically
May 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Bryan K. Escobar. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/14/2019 TRANSFERRING this action to the USDC for the Southern District of California. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]
April 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Bryan K. Escobar. (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-0366-TLN-KJN (PC). (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION for PRESENTENCE CUSTODY CREDITS and CONDUCT CREDITS by Bryan K. Escobar (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Bryan K. Escobar. (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]
March 18, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Bryan K. Escobar to updated address. (Plummer, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility 480 Alta Road San Diego, CA 92179 by Bryan K. Escobar. (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]
March 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Bryan K. Escobar. (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against People of Inglewood, CA by Bryan K. Escobar.(Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Escobar v. People of Inglewood, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?