Durant v. Laureate Education Inc. et al

Plaintiff: John Durant
Defendant: Laureate Education Inc. and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Case Number: 3:2019cv00917
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. Laureate Education Inc. answer due 7/29/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/9/2019. (jdt)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Laureate Education Inc.. (Eisenberg, Sheldon)Attorney Sheldon Eliot Eisenberg added to party Laureate Education Inc.(pty:dft) Modified on 7/8/2019 - Sent QC email reminder to include signature certification. No refile (jdt).
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Durant. Laureate Education Inc. served. (Carreon, Ryan) (jdt).
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Evan Carreon on behalf of John Durant (Carreon, Ryan) Attorney Ryan Evan Carreon added to party John Durant(pty:pla) (jdt).
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao).
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, Laureate Education Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12514355.), filed by John Durant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00917-LAB-BGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Higbee, Mathew)(mme) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #2 Copyright Report)[Copyright report mailed] (mme). (Main Document and Attachment replaced on 5/15/2019 to correct text, attorney association) (mme). (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durant v. Laureate Education Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Durant
Represented By: Ryan Evan Carreon
Represented By: Mathew Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laureate Education Inc.
Represented By: Sheldon Eliot Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?