Stroud v. Neuschmid et al

Petitioner: Coleridge B. Stroud
Respondent: Javier Becerra and Robert Neuschmid
Case Number: 3:2019cv00924
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P Beesley on behalf of Robert Neuschmid (Beesley, Christopher) (jms).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying as moot #2 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/22/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (1) NOTICE of opportunity to consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (28 USC 636(c), F.R.C.P. 73), and (2) ORDER requiring response to Petition (28 USC 2254, Rule 4). Motion to Dismiss due 7/22/2019, Opposition to Motion due 8/22/2019 OR Answer by Respondent due 7/22/2019 Traverse by Petitioner due 8/22/2019. Petitioner has consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge.Respondent must execute and return either a Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and Order of Reference or a Notice of Intent to Proceed before District Judge to the Clerk of Court on or before July 1, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences (forms mailed to Petitioner). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/20/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Coleridge B. Stroud. (anh)(jao).
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Coleridge B. Stroud. (anh) (jao).
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Javier Becerra, Robert Neuschmid ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number CAS111854.), filed by Coleridge B. Stroud. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:19-cv-924-JLS-WVG. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Coleridge B. Stroud)[Case in Screening] (anh) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroud v. Neuschmid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Javier Becerra
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Neuschmid
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Christopher P Beesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Coleridge B. Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?