Chatman v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Eric Chatman
Defendant: Mitch Smith, Toyota Corporation in Irvine, Toyota of Escondido and Rick Whitting
Case Number: 3:2019cv00933
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Rejecting Document: Letter, from Plaintiff Eric Chatman. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Plaintiff's case is closed. Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters to the judge. See Civ. L. Rule 83.9. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/17/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (jah).
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Toyota Corporation in Irvine, Toyota of Escondido, Mitch Smith, Rick Whitting against Eric Chatman. Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to proceed IFP as barred by 28 USC 1915(g). Court dismisses the civil action without prejudice for failure to pay the full statutory and administrative $400 civil filing fee required by 28 USC 1914(a). Court certifies that an IFP appeal from this Order would be frivolous and would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3). The case is closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (sjt).
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Court denies Plaintiff's Motion for IFP as barred by 28 USC 1915(g). Court dismisses this civil action without prejudice for failure to pay the full statutory and administrative $400 civil filing fee required by 28 USC 1914(a). Court certifies that an IFP appeal from this Order would be frivolous and would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3). Court directs the Clerk to enter judgment and close the file. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/13/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Chatman. (anh) (jao).
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mitch Smith, Toyota Corporation in Irvine, Toyota of Escondido, Rick Whitting, IFP Filed, filed by Eric Chatman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-933-BAS-JLB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Eric Chatman)[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (anh) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatman v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Corporation in Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota of Escondido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Whitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?