Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc. v. Honig et al
Plaintiff: Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Barry Honig, Southern Biotech, Inc., Michael Brauser, GRQ Consultants, Inc., Andrew Haag, John Stetson, Frost Gamma Investments Trust, Robert Prag, Irth Communications, LLC, 11 East Airy Street Partnership, The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc., GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Barry Honig, GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Renee Honig, Grander Holdings Inc. 401k, Robert Haag, Barry and Renee Honig Charitable Foundation, Inc., John H. Ford, Alpha Capital Anstalt, GRQ Consultants, Inc. 401k, Phillip Frost, John O'Rourke, III, Airy Properties, ATG Capital, LLC, Grander Holdings, Inc., The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc. Retirement Plan Trust, OPKO Health, Inc., HS Contrarian Investments, LLC, Melechdavid, Inc. Retirement Plan, Melechda Vid, Inc., Steven Rubin, Mark Groussman and Melechdavid, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00981
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
2 Judge: William Q Hayes
3 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #21 ) is granted. This action is remanded to the Superior Court for the State of California, County of San Diego, where it was originally filed under case number 37-2019-00018398-CU-SL-CTL. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. #8 , #38 , #68 ) are denied as moot (Certified copy sent to State Court via US Mail Service). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/04/2019. (ag) (jao).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: The deadline for Defendant John H. Ford to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to thirty (30) days from the date on which the Court issues an order ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF. No. #21 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/30/2019. (ag)
September 26, 2019 Filing 96 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by John H. Ford. (Horton, Timothy) (tcf).
September 26, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Alan Horton on behalf of John H. Ford (Horton, Timothy)Attorney Timothy Alan Horton added to party John H. Ford(pty:dft) (tcf).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting Joint #93 Motion Requesting Relief From Clerk's Entry of Default. Defendants shall have until 10 days after the Court issues an Order on the pending Motion to Remand (ECF No. 21) to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/21/19. (dlg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 93 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Default /Defendants Relief from Clerk's Entry of Default by Mark Groussman, Melechdavid, Inc., Melechdavid, Inc. Retirement Plan. (Totino, Edward)Attorney Edward D Totino added to party Mark Groussman(pty:dft), Attorney Edward D Totino added to party Melechdavid, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward D Totino added to party Melechdavid, Inc. Retirement Plan(pty:dft) (tcf).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw Michael Mena as Counsel (ECF No. #84 ) is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/13/2019. (ag)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting OPKO Defendants' #85 Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. The 8/26/2019 Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference is vacated until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 8/12/2019. (ag) (Main Document 91 replaced on 8/13/2019) (ag).
August 12, 2019 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION to Dismiss Party Objections to the Declaration of John O'Rourke, Jr. Filed in Reply to Airy Properties and 11 East Air Street Partnership's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [Dkt. No. 83] filed by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.. (Shapiro, Jonathan) (ag).
August 8, 2019 Filing 89 REPLY in Support re #85 MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference filed by Alpha Capital Anstalt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca Kahan Waldman, #2 Exhibit 1 to R. Waldman Declaration)(La Bella, Charles) (ag).
August 8, 2019 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #85 MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference filed by Phillip Frost, Frost Gamma Investments Trust, OPKO Health, Inc., Steven Rubin. (Mandell, Joshua) (ag).
August 7, 2019 Filing 87 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12804789.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
August 7, 2019 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #85 MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and CMC filed by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.. (Shapiro, Jonathan) (ag).
August 6, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference by OPKO Health, Inc., Steven Rubin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Mandell, Joshua) (ag).
August 5, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by OPKO Health, Inc., Steven Rubin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Mena, Michael)Attorney Michael O Mena added to party Steven Rubin(pty:dft) (ag).
August 4, 2019 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Airy Properties. (Harvey, William) (jrm).
July 29, 2019 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION to Dismiss Party 11 East Airy Street Partnership's and Airy Properties' Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) filed by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration J. David Hansen, #2 Proof of Service)(Rice, Tania) 9 (ag).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting #67 Joint Motion to Extend the Airy Properties and 11 East Airy Street Partnership Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Airy Properties and 11 East Airy Street Partnership have an extension to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for 10 days after the Court's Order on the pending Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/29/2019. (ag)
July 29, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Tania Lauren Rice on behalf of Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc. (Rice, Tania)Attorney Tania Lauren Rice added to party Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.(pty:pla) (ag).
July 29, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian James Jacobsmeyer on behalf of Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc. (Jacobsmeyer, Brian)Attorney Brian James Jacobsmeyer added to party Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.(pty:pla) (ag).
July 26, 2019 Filing 78 PRO HAC APPROVED re #76 : Michael Steven Sommer appearing for Defendants Barry and Renee Honig Charitable Foundation, Inc., GRQ Consultants, Inc., GRQ Consultants, Inc. 401k, GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Barry Honig, GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Renee Honig, Barry Honig, Southern Biotech, Inc. (no document attached) (mdc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 77 PRO HAC APPROVED re #75 : Adam Ross Toporovsky appearing for Defendants Barry and Renee Honig Charitable Foundation, Inc., GRQ Consultants, Inc., GRQ Consultants, Inc. 401k, GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Barry Honig, GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Renee Honig, Barry Honig, Southern Biotech, Inc. (no document attached) (mdc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 76 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12763593 - See #74 .) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Sommer, Michael) Modified text on 7/26/2019 to add filing fee info. (mdc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 75 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12763363 - See #73 .) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Toporovsky, Adam) Modified text on 7/26/2019 to add filing fee info. (mdc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 74 *** REFILED AS #76 *** - Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12763593.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Sommer, Michael) 7/26/2019 - Signature is missing. Modified text to indicate refiled status. (mdc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 73 *** REFILED AS #75 *** - Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12763363.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Toporovsky, Adam) 7/26/2019 - Signature is missing. Modified text to add filing fee info and indicate refiled status. (mdc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 72 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mark Groussman, Melechdavid, Inc. and Melechdavid, Inc. Retirement Plan (ag).
July 18, 2019 Filing 71 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Mark Groussman, Melechdavid, Inc., and Melechdavid, Inc. Retirement Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proof of Service)(Shapiro, Jonathan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Reply by Airy Properties (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Harvey, William) (tcf).
July 12, 2019 Filing 69 ***Document Withdrawn per ECF #70 *** REPLY to Response to Motion re #68 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Airy Properties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Harvey, William) (tcf). Modified to withdraw document on 7/19/2019 (tcf).
July 11, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Airy Properties. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Harvey, William) (jrm).
July 11, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Airy Properties. (Harvey, William)Attorney William P. Harvey added to party Airy Properties(pty:dft) (jrm).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Edward M. Spiro, re #54 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/10/2019.(dsn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court Reply in Support of Motion for Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1452(B) to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Diego filed by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (ag).
July 8, 2019 Filing 64 REPLY - Other re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12 (b)(2) and 12 (b)(6) filed by OPKO Health, Inc., Steven Rubin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Mandell, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration of A. Logal)(Mandell, Joshua) (ag).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Adam Fee, re #58 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/8/2019. (mdc)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of George S. Canellos, re #59 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/8/2019. (mdc)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting #60 Joint Motion for Extend Defendants John Stetson and HS Contrarian Investments, LLC'S Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.The Stetson Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint no later than ten days after the Court's entry of an order on the motion to remand. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 07/03/2019. (mme)
July 2, 2019 Filing 60 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by HS Contrarian Investments, LLC, John Stetson. (Vora, Samir) (tcf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 59 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12683910.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Canellos, George) (Main Document 59 replaced on 7/3/2019 re file format.) (mdc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 58 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12683852.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Fee, Adam) (Main Document 58 replaced on 7/3/2019 re file format.) (mdc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting #47 Joint Motion to Extend Defendants Robert Haag, Andrew Haag and Irth Communications, LLC's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Andrew Haag, Robert Haag and IRTH Communications, LLC may have until 6/30/2019 to respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Hearing on Defendants Andrew Haag, Robert Haag, and IRTH Communications LLC's Motion to Dismiss, which was filed with this Court on 6/27/2019, together with the corresponding briefing schedule, is continued to a date no sooner than 38 days after the Court rules on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/1/2019. (ag)
July 2, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Joinder by ATG Capital, LLC, John O'Rourke, III re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion (Luskey, Randall) (tcf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Joinder by Barry and Renee Honig Charitable Foundation, Inc., GRQ Consultants, Inc., GRQ Consultants, Inc. 401k, GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Barry Honig, GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Renee Honig, Barry Honig, Southern Biotech, Inc. re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Weber, Robert) (tcf).
July 2, 2019 Filing 54 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12568048 - See #6 .) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Spiro, Edward) Modified text on 7/3/2019 to add filing fee info. (mdc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Michael O. Mena (Re: ECF #34 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/1/2019.(jrd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Plaintiff Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Defendants Opko Health, Inc., Steven Rubin, Phillip Frost, and Frost Gamma Investments Trust's Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. David Hansen, #2 Proof of Service)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (ag).
July 1, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Joinder by Michael Brauser re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Pancer, Michael) (ag).
July 1, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Samir L. Vora on behalf of HS Contrarian Investments, LLC, John Stetson (Vora, Samir)Attorney Samir L. Vora added to party HS Contrarian Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Samir L. Vora added to party John Stetson(pty:dft) (ag).
July 1, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OPKO Health, Inc., Steven Rubin re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion (Mandell, Joshua) (ag).
July 1, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by OPKO Health, Inc., Steven Rubin. (Mandell, Joshua) (ag).
June 28, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc.12(B)(3)and 12(B)(6) by Andrew Haag, Robert Haag, Irth Communications, LLC. (Tushinsky-Fox, Jacques) (ag).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting #36 Joint Motion to Extend the O'Rourke Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The ORourke Defendants have ten days from the date of the Court's Order on the pending Motion to Remand to respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/28/2019. (ag)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting #40 Joint Motion Regarding Defendant Alpha Capital Anstalt's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Alpha Capital Anstalt shall have ten (10) days from the date of the Court's Order on the pending Motion to Remand (ECF No. #21 ), to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages (ECF No. 1-2). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/28/2019. (ag)
June 28, 2019 Filing 44 PRO HAC APPROVED: Dennis Alan Richard appearing for Defendants Michael Brauser, Grander Holdings Inc. 401k, Grander Holdings, Inc. (no document attached) (dsn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 43 PRO HAC APPROVED: Kimberly Sinclair Rollnick appearing for Defendants Michael Brauser, Grander Holdings Inc. 401k, Grander Holdings, Inc. (no document attached) (dsn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 42 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12670341.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rollnick, Kimberly) (dsn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 41 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12669856.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Richard, Dennis) (dsn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Regarding Defendant Alpha Capital Anstalt's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Alpha Capital Anstalt. (La Bella, Charles) (ag).
June 27, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles G. La Bella on behalf of Alpha Capital Anstalt (La Bella, Charles) (ag).
June 27, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc.12(B)(3)and 12(B)(6) by Andrew Haag, Robert Haag, Irth Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration andrew haag)(Tushinsky-Fox, Jacques)Attorney Jacques Tushinsky-Fox added to party Andrew Haag(pty:dft), Attorney Jacques Tushinsky-Fox added to party Robert Haag(pty:dft), Attorney Jacques Tushinsky-Fox added to party Irth Communications, LLC(pty:dft) (ag).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting #27 Joint Motion to Extend the Brauser Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Michael Brauser, Grander Holdings, Inc., and Grander Holdings Inc., 401K shall have ten days from the date of the Court's Order on the pending Motion to Remand (ECF No. #21 ), to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint for Damages (ECF No. 1-2). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/27/2019. (ag)
June 27, 2019 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File the O'Rourke Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ATG Capital, LLC, John O'Rourke, III. (Luskey, Randall) (ag).
June 27, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Scott Luskey on behalf of ATG Capital, LLC, John O'Rourke, III (Luskey, Randall)Attorney Randall Scott Luskey added to party ATG Capital, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Randall Scott Luskey added to party John O'Rourke, III(pty:dft) (ag).
June 27, 2019 Filing 34 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Mena, Michael) (mdc)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #26 Joint Motion to Extend the Honig Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for the Honig Defendants to file a response to Plaintiffs complaint is extended from 6/30/2019 to ten ( 10) days from the date on which the Court issues an order ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand, filed on 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/27/2019. (ag)
June 27, 2019 Filing 32 PRO HAC APPROVED re #31 : Andrew J. Levander appearing for Defendant Alpha Capital Anstalt. (no document attached) (mdc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 31 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12666905.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Levander, Andrew) (mdc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 30 PRO HAC APPROVED re #29 : Rebecca Waldman appearing for Defendant Alpha Capital Anstalt. (no document attached) (mdc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 29 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12666409.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Waldman, Rebecca) (mdc)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Brian P. Miller (Re: ECF No. #3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/27/2019.(jrd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Michael Brauser. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Pancer, Michael)Attorney Michael Pancer added to party Michael Brauser(pty:dft)(ag).
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Honig Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Barry and Renee Honig Charitable Foundation, Inc., GRQ Consultants, Inc., GRQ Consultants, Inc. 401k, GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Barry Honig, GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Renee Honig, Barry Honig, Southern Biotech, Inc.. (Weber, Robert)Attorney Robert David Weber added to party Barry and Renee Honig Charitable Foundation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert David Weber added to party GRQ Consultants, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert David Weber added to party GRQ Consultants, Inc. 401k(pty:dft), Attorney Robert David Weber added to party GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Barry Honig(pty:dft), Attorney Robert David Weber added to party GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Renee Honig(pty:dft), Attorney Robert David Weber added to party Barry Honig(pty:dft), Attorney Robert David Weber added to party Southern Biotech, Inc.(pty:dft) (ag).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Notice and Order Continuing Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 8/26/2019 at 1:30 PM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. If the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will conduct a Case Management Conference.A Joint Discovery Plan is due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 6/24/2019.(ag)
June 21, 2019 Filing 24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Miller, Brian) (dsn)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. Judge Cynthia Bashant, Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:18-cv-02494-WQH-MSB. The new case number is 19cv981-WQH-MSB.Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/18/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/17/2019. (jah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc. of case(s) 3:18cv2494-WQH-MSB. (Shapiro, Jonathan). Modified on 6/17/2019 - Proposed Low Number Transfer Order prepared and forwarded. Edited text (jah).
June 13, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Shapiro, Jonathan). Modified on 6/14/2019 - Removed extra added duplicate text (jah).
June 11, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate OPKO Health, Inc. for Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc... (Shapiro, Jonathan). (jah).
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Defendants John ORourke, III and ATG Capital, LLC by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc. (Shapiro, Jonathan). (jah).
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Defendants Melechdavid, Inc. and Melechdavid, Inc. Retirement Plan by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc. (Shapiro, Jonathan). (jah).
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Defendant Mark Groussman by Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc. (Shapiro, Jonathan). (jah).
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Acker Shapiro on behalf of Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc. (Shapiro, Jonathan). (jah).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Edward M. Spiro, re #6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/4/2019. (mdc)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Brian P. Miller, re #3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/4/2019. (mdc)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Michael O. Mena, re #4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/4/2019. (mdc)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/19/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. In the event the case does not settle during the ENE, Court will conduct an Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Discovery Plan to be filed in CM/ECF by 7/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/4/2019. (jah)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 Corrected DECLARATION of Dr. Phillip Frost by OPKO Health, Inc., Steven Rubin re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Mandell, Joshua). Modified on 6/4/2019 - Wrong event. Corrected text to match pleading (jah).
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stevens, Todd). (jah).
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc., The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc. Retirement Plan Trust (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stevens, Todd). (jah).
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by OPKO Health, Inc., Steven Rubin. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of OPKO Health, #3 Declaration of Steven Rubin, #4 Declaration of Phillip Frost)(Mandell, Joshua). Modified on 6/3/2019 - Decl. of Frost not signed, per JRD, CM/ECF Coord., atty will re-file Declaration. Edited attachment descriptions (jah).
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Robert Prag, The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc., The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc. Retirement Plan Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stevens, Todd). Attorney Todd Frederick Stevens added to party Robert Prag(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Frederick Stevens added to party The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Frederick Stevens added to party The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc. Retirement Plan Trust (pty:dft). (jah).
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12568048.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Spiro, Edward) (mdc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Rose Bugni on behalf of Phillip Frost, Frost Gamma Investments Trust (Bugni, Lisa)Attorney Lisa Rose Bugni added to party Phillip Frost(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa Rose Bugni added to party Frost Gamma Investments Trust(pty:dft) (rmc).
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12563240.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Mena, Michael) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/30/2019 to correct image format.) (mdc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12561256.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Miller, Brian) (dsn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OPKO Health, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (jrm) (jao).
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02019-00018398-CU-SL-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12549765.), filed by OPKO Health, Inc., Steven Rubin. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)The new case number is 3:19-cv-981-BAS-BLM. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(jrm) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc. v. Honig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Honig
Represented By: Robert David Weber
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Adam Ross Toporovsky
Represented By: Michael Steven Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Biotech, Inc.
Represented By: Robert David Weber
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Adam Ross Toporovsky
Represented By: Michael Steven Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brauser
Represented By: Dennis Alan Richard
Represented By: Kimberly Sinclair Rollnick
Represented By: Michael Pancer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRQ Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Robert David Weber
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Adam Ross Toporovsky
Represented By: Michael Steven Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Haag
Represented By: Jacques Tushinsky-Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stetson
Represented By: Adam Fee
Represented By: George Canellos
Represented By: Samir L. Vora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frost Gamma Investments Trust
Represented By: Lisa Rose Bugni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Prag
Represented By: Todd Frederick Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irth Communications, LLC
Represented By: Jacques Tushinsky-Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11 East Airy Street Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Frederick Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Barry Honig
Represented By: Robert David Weber
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Adam Ross Toporovsky
Represented By: Michael Steven Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRQ Consultants, Inc. Roth 401k FBO Renee Honig
Represented By: Robert David Weber
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Adam Ross Toporovsky
Represented By: Michael Steven Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grander Holdings Inc. 401k
Represented By: Dennis Alan Richard
Represented By: Kimberly Sinclair Rollnick
Represented By: Michael Pancer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Haag
Represented By: Jacques Tushinsky-Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry and Renee Honig Charitable Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Robert David Weber
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Adam Ross Toporovsky
Represented By: Michael Steven Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Ford
Represented By: Timothy Alan Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Capital Anstalt
Represented By: Charles G. La Bella
Represented By: Andrew J. Levander
Represented By: Rebecca Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRQ Consultants, Inc. 401k
Represented By: Robert David Weber
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Adam Ross Toporovsky
Represented By: Michael Steven Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Frost
Represented By: Edward M. Spiro
Represented By: Lisa Rose Bugni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O'Rourke, III
Represented By: Randall Scott Luskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airy Properties
Represented By: William P. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATG Capital, LLC
Represented By: Randall Scott Luskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grander Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Alan Richard
Represented By: Kimberly Sinclair Rollnick
Represented By: Michael Pancer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Del Mar Consulting Group, Inc. Retirement Plan Trust
Represented By: Todd Frederick Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPKO Health, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Robert Mandell
Represented By: Brian P. Miller
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HS Contrarian Investments, LLC
Represented By: Adam Fee
Represented By: George Canellos
Represented By: Samir L. Vora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melechdavid, Inc. Retirement Plan
Represented By: Edward D Totino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melechda Vid, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Rubin
Represented By: Joshua Robert Mandell
Represented By: Michael O Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Groussman
Represented By: Edward D Totino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melechdavid, Inc.
Represented By: Edward D Totino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mabvax Therapeutics Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Acker Shapiro
Represented By: Tania Lauren Rice
Represented By: Brian James Jacobsmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?