United States of America v. 86,147.85 USD In U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Respondent: 86,147.05 USD In U.S. Currency
Claimant: Kyra Foster and Crystal Westbrooks
Case Number: 3:2019cv00992
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
2 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 31 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by United States of America (Whittlesey, Brent) (ag).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER (AGS): Plaintiff's counsel's request to appear telephonically at the Early Neutral Evaluation (ECF No. #28 ) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/23/2019. (no document attached) (mjg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Compel to Compel Responses To First Set Of Special Interrogatories To Claimant Kyra Foster by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Whittlesey, Brent) (ag).
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION (Stipulated Request) For Order Authorizing Telephonic Appearance At Early Neutral Evaluation by United States of America. (Whittlesey, Brent) (ag).
June 17, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kyra Foster.(Barnett, Richard) (ag).
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv0992-WQH-AGS.(no document attached) (anh)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) Vacating Prior Scheduling Order; (2) For Early Neutral Evaluation; (3) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/31/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/31/2019.(anh)
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Whittlesey, Brent) (jao).
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (jpp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:19-cv-00518. Original file received electronically
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-entitled action be transferred from the Central District of California to the Southern District of California. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 WITHDRAWAL of, Claim #16 , filed by Claimant Crystal Westbrooks. (Cindrich, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California filed by Claimant Kyra Foster. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Transferring case)(Barnett, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kyra Foster answer now due 6/17/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Claimant Kyra Foster.(Barnett, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 17 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication upon Defendant All Defendants. Publication was made in the official government website: www.forfeiture.gov for 30 consecutive days. (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 16 CLAIM filed by Claimant Crystal Westbrooks. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cindrich, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard M Barnett counsel for Claimant Kyra Foster. Filed by Claimant Kyra Foster. (Barnett, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Claimant Kyra Foster, identifying Kyra Foster, Richard M. Barnett. (Barnett, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Richard M Barnett on behalf of Claimant Kyra Foster (Attorney Richard M Barnett added to party Kyra Foster(pty:clm))(Barnett, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM filed by Claimant Kyra Foster. (Barnett, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT for seizure of $86,147.85 In U.S. Currency issued on Complaint #1 . (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RE ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 03/22/2019, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attorney Brent A Whittlesey added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Whittlesey, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 86,147.85 USD In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kyra Foster
Represented By: Richard M Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Crystal Westbrooks
Represented By: Michael Cindrich
Represented By: Ernie W Chen
Represented By: Ernie W. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 86,147.05 USD In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brent A Whittlesey
Represented By: Brent Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?