United States of America v. Nelson
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Larry Nelson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01087
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Larry Nelson.(Holben, Donald)Attorney Donald R Holben added to party Larry Nelson(pty:dft) QC Email: Document not signed by cm/ecf user(anh).
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Larry Nelson served. (Bryant, Aurora) (anh).
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Nicole de Kervor on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(de Kervor, Dylan)Attorney Dylan Nicole de Kervor added to party United States of America(pty:pla) (anh).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Aurora Bryant and Dylan de Kervor by Aurora Rose Bryant on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Bryant, Aurora)Attorney Aurora Rose Bryant added to party United States of America(pty:pla) QC Email: Atty de Kervor, must refile NOA using their own cm/ecf account. (anh).
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Larry Nelson, Fee Waived, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01087-CAB-WVG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Gardner, Leslie)(als) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Nelson
Represented By: Donald R Holben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Leslie Marie Gardner
Represented By: Dylan Nicole de Kervor
Represented By: Aurora Rose Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?