Thuraissigiam v. Archambeault et al
Petitioner: Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam
Respondent: Greg Archambeault, Mark Morgan, Robert Garcia, Jr., William Barr and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01092
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: Linda Lopez
3 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam (Perez, Celso)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-00135-AJB-AGS. The new case number is 19-cv-01092-AJB-AGS.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/17/2019.(sjm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 by Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perez, Celso) QC mailer sent re attached proposed order (jms).
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Brief in Support of Petition and Accompanying Exhibits. (Perez, Celso) (jms).
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam of case(s) 18-00135 . (Perez, Celso) (jms).
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey T. Miller for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-cv-1092-JM-LL.(no document attached) (anh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Greg Archambeault, William Barr, Robert Garcia, Jr, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark Morgan, filed by Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam. (Filing fee $5 - receipt number: 0974-12606259) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1092-BEN-LL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Perez, Celso)(jms) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thuraissigiam v. Archambeault et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Archambeault
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Morgan
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Garcia, Jr.
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vijayakumar Thuraissigiam
Represented By: Celso Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?