Carter Pool v. Ameripark, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carter Pool
Defendant: Ameripark, LLC and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2019cv01103
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Vacating Pre-Early Neutral Evaluation Telephonic Conference. The Court vacates the pre-Early Neutral Evaluation telephonic conference previously set for 8/9/2019 at 8:00 A.M. in light of Plaintiff Carter Pool's pending Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/6/2019. (jdt)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER. Currently on calendar for Monday, 8/12/2019 at 11:15 a.m. is a hearing on Plaintiff's motion to remand (Docket no. #8 ). The Court finds this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on this motion is taken off calendar and this matter is taken under submission. No appearances will be required in this matter on 8/12/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/6/2019. (jdt)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carter Pool. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Appendix, #3 Proof of Service)(Reese, Nathan). Modified on 8/6/2019 - Exceeds page limit of Civ LR 7.1(h). Sent QC email reminder. No refile (jdt).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on #11 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The Court vacates the Early Neutral Evaluation previously set for 8/16/2019 at 2:00 P.M. in light of Plaintiff Carter Pool's pending Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/29/2019. (jdt)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ameripark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Certificate of Service)(Alguire, Marissa). Modified on 7/30/2019 - Sent QC email reminder about use of s/ by nonregistered user. No refile (jdt).
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Deadline for Lodging of Joint Discovery Plan, And All Associated Dates by Carter Pool. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Reese, Nathan) (tcf).
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Carter Pool Document No. 9. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Reese, Nathan) (tcf).
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 ***Document Withdrawn per ECF #10 *** Joint MOTION to Vacate Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Deadline for Lodging of Joint Discovery Plan and All Associated Dates by Carter Pool. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Reese, Nathan) Modified to withdraw document on 7/24/2019 (tcf).
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carter Pool. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Appendix Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Reese, Nathan). Modified on 7/15/2019 - Sent QC email reminder re proposed order attachment and s/ by nonregistered user. No refile (jdt).
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameripark, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, RE FILING OF NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND CLERK OF THE CALIFORNIA SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT (Alguire, Marissa) (jdt).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC") will be held on 8/16/2019, at 2:00 P.M., before United States Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Additionally, on 8/9/2019, beginning at 8:00 A.M., the Court will hold an attorneys-only telephonic status conference with each party separately. A joint discovery plan shall be lodged with Magistrate Judge Gallo on or before 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/18/2019. (jdt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-cv-1103-LAB-WVG.(no document attached) (anh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ameripark, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (als)(jao).
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ameripark, LLC. No Additional Parties With Financial Interest. (als) (jao).
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ameripark, LLC. (als) (jao).
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of California County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00023222-CU-OE-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12612875.), filed by Ameripark, LLC, DOES 1-50. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #7 Declaration of Stephanie Lorenzo ISO Notice of Removal, #8 Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01103-BEN-WVG. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(als) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter Pool v. Ameripark, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameripark, LLC
Represented By: Marissa Alguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Pool
Represented By: Nathan Jeremy Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?