Ewing v. Oxford Tax Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: Anton Ewing
Defendant: Oxford Tax Partners, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01112
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #4 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint on or before August 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/29/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Anton Ewing. (aef)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oxford Tax Partners, LLC re #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Wright, Kimberly) (aef).
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Oxford Tax Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimberly A. Wright ISO)(Wright, Kimberly)Attorney Kimberly A. Wright added to party Oxford Tax Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (aef).
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anton Ewing. Oxford Tax Partners, LLC served. (aef)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (als)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Oxford Tax Partners, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS112613.), filed by Anton Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit G- Findings and Admonition to Plaintiff)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01112-DMS-LL. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Ewing, Anton)(als)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. Oxford Tax Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Tax Partners, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?