Boyd v. USA
Petitioner: Javay Boyd
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01189
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Appealability Denied as to Javay Boyd. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/3/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED * The motion is denied.* (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (sjt).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Denying #1 Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/1/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Petition to Vacate under 28 USC 2255, filed by Javay Boyd. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (jrm) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Ryan A. Sausedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javay Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?