Debato v. Madden et al
Plaintiff: Haneze Debate and Haneze Debato
Defendant: E.M. Ramirez, Warden Raymond Madden and Lieutenant J. Bonilla
Case Number: 3:2019cv01211
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Haneze Debato. Nunc Pro Tunc 7/17/2019. (jms)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge William Q. Hayes Accepting Document: Motion to Proceed IFP, from Plaintiff Haneze Debato. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Duplicate. IFP Motion previously filed and pending before District Judge. See ECF No. #2 . Complaint submitted for screening per 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. Nunc Pro Tunc 7/17/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/18/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Haneze Debato. (jms)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Haneze Debato. (jms) (jao).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against J. Bonilla, Raymond Madden, E.M. Ramirez, filed by Haneze Debato.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CDCR Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1211-WQH-LL. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debato v. Madden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.M. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Raymond Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant J. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haneze Debate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haneze Debato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?