Rodriguez v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Rodriguez
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated Long Term Disability Plan and Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, .
Case Number: 3:2019cv01215
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Qualcomm Incorporated Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Russum, Blake) (jrm).
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, an Indiana insurance company, Corporate Parent Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation, a publicly held corporation for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Russum, Blake) (jrm).
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Qualcomm Incorporated Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Russum, Blake) (jrm).
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Russum, Blake)(jrm).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. This Court grants the joint motion and extends Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint until 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/31/2019. (acc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Qualcomm Incorporated Long Term Disability Plan. (Russum, Blake)Attorney Blake Justin Russum added to party Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston(pty:dft), Attorney Blake Justin Russum added to party Qualcomm Incorporated Long Term Disability Plan(pty:dft)(acc).
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn R. Kantor on behalf of Nancy Rodriguez (Kantor, Glenn)Attorney Glenn R. Kantor added to party Nancy Rodriguez(pty:pla) (acc).
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Rodriguez. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served. (Sessions, Peter) (acc).
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Rodriguez. Qualcomm Incorporated Long Term Disability Plan served. (Sessions, Peter) (acc).
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Nancy Rodriguez re #1 Complaint, (Sessions, Peter) (acc).
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa) (jao).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Qualcomm Incorporated Long Term Disability Plan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12672228.), filed by Nancy Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01215-AJB-MSB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Sessions, Peter)(sxa) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Rodriguez
Represented By: Peter S. Sessions
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Incorporated Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Blake Justin Russum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, .
Represented By: Blake Justin Russum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?