United States of America et al v. Get Engineering Corporation et al
Plaintiff: MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc. and United States of America
Respondent: Rodney Tuttle, Guille E. Tuttle, Greg MacNeil, David Grundies, Leslie Adams and Get Engineering Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01249
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 51 Pretrial Disclosures by MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc. Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) (Canni, Todd) (jdt).
August 30, 2019 Filing 50 Pretrial Disclosures by Get Engineering Corporation Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) (Pate, William) (jdt).
August 22, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Leslie Mason on behalf of Leslie Adams, Get Engineering Corporation, David Grundies, Greg MacNeil, Guille E. Tuttle, Rodney Tuttle (Mason, Susan)Attorney Susan Leslie Mason added to party Leslie Adams(pty:res), Attorney Susan Leslie Mason added to party Get Engineering Corporation(pty:res), Attorney Susan Leslie Mason added to party David Grundies(pty:res), Attorney Susan Leslie Mason added to party Greg MacNeil(pty:res), Attorney Susan Leslie Mason added to party Guille E. Tuttle(pty:res), Attorney Susan Leslie Mason added to party Rodney Tuttle(pty:res) (dlg).
August 13, 2019 Filing 48 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc. (Canni, Todd). Modified on 8/14/2019 - Sent QC email to have signer for Respondents to file Notice of Appearance. No refile (jdt).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. The Joint Discovery Plan is due on 9/16/2019. The Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are set for 9/25/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 7/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf) (jao). Modified text on 7/31/2019 (tcf).
July 22, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Leslie Adams, Get Engineering Corporation, David Grundies, Greg MacNeil, Guille E. Tuttle, Rodney Tuttle.(Pate, William) (tcf).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER (AGS): In light of the transfer, all answers to the complaint are due September 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 07/09/2019.(no document attached) (mxa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 43 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:18-cv-00277. Original file received electronically
July 2, 2019 Filing 44 Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (acc)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (Doc. #39 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion and TRANSFERS the action to the Southern District of California. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) Case transferred electronically. (jp) Modified on 6/20/2019 (jp). [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California #39 filed by Defendants Leslie Adams, Get Engineering Corporation, David Grundies, Greg MacNeil, Guille E. Tuttle, Rodney Tuttle. (Pate, William) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California #39 filed by Plaintiff MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc.. (Massoudi, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California filed by Defendants Leslie Adams, Get Engineering Corporation, David Grundies, Greg MacNeil, Guille E. Tuttle, Rodney Tuttle. Motion set for hearing on 6/21/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue; or in Alternative to Transfer for Convenience, #2 Declaration of Defendant Guille E. Tuttle in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue; or in Alternative to Transfer for Convenience, #3 Declaration of Defendant Leslie Adams in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue; or in Alternative to Transfer for Convenience, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue; or in Alternative to Transfer for Convenience) (Pate, William) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney William C Pate for Defendant Leslie Adams in place and stead of Attorneys Gary Scott Pancer, Michael P. McCloskey, David J. Aveni, Scott #32 . (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney William C Pate for Defendant David Grundies in place and stead of Attorneys Gary Scott Pancer, Michael P. McCloskey, David J. Aveni, Scott #31 . (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney William C Pate for Defendant Greg MacNeil in place and stead of Attorneys Gary Scott Pancer, Michael P. McCloskey, David J. Aveni, Scott #30 . (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney William C Pate for Defendant Rodney Tuttle in place and stead of Attorneys Gary Scott Pancer, Michael P. McCloskey, David J. Aveni, Scott #29 . (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney William C Pate for Defendant Guille E Tuttle in place and stead of Attorneys Gary Scott Pancer, Michael P. McCloskey, David J. Aveni, Scott #28 . (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney William C Pate for Defendant Get Engineering Corporation in place and stead of Attorneys Gary Scott Pancer, Michael P. McCloskey, David J. Aveni, Scott #27 . (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 32 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY William C. Pate in place of attorney Gary Scott Pancer filed by Defendant Leslie Adams. (Attorney William C Pate added to party Leslie Adams(pty:dft)) (Pate, William) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 31 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY William C. Pate in place of attorney Gary Scott Pancer filed by Defendant David Grundies. (Attorney William C Pate added to party David Grundies(pty:dft)) (Pate, William) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 30 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY William C. Pate in place of attorney Gary Scott Pancer filed by Defendant Greg MacNeil. (Attorney William C Pate added to party Greg MacNeil(pty:dft)) (Pate, William) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 29 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY William C. Pate in place of attorney Gary Scott Pancer filed by Defendant Rodney Tuttle. (Attorney William C Pate added to party Rodney Tuttle(pty:dft)) (Pate, William) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 28 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY William C. Pate in place of attorney Gary Scott Pancer filed by Defendant Guille E. Tuttle. (Attorney William C Pate added to party Guille E. Tuttle(pty:dft)) (Pate, William) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY William C. Pate in place of attorney Gary Scott Pancer filed by Defendant Get Engineering Corporation. (Attorney William C Pate added to party Get Engineering Corporation(pty:dft)) (Pate, William) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 26 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Greg MacNeil answer now due 5/8/2019; Guille E. Tuttle answer now due 5/8/2019; David Grundies answer now due 5/8/2019; Get Engineering Corporation answer now due 5/8/2019; Leslie Adams answer now due 5/8/2019; Rodney Tuttle answer now due 5/8/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendants Greg MacNeil; Guille E. Tuttle; David Grundies; Get Engineering Corporation; Leslie Adams; Rodney Tuttle.(Pancer, Gary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendants Leslie Adams, Get Engineering Corporation, David Grundies, Greg MacNeil, Guille E. Tuttle, Rodney Tuttle. (Pancer, Gary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Leslie Adams answer now due 4/26/2019; Get Engineering Corporation answer now due 4/26/2019; David Grundies answer now due 4/26/2019; Greg MacNeil answer now due 4/26/2019; Guille E. Tuttle answer now due 4/26/2019; Rodney Tuttle answer now due 4/26/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc..(Attorney Gary Scott Pancer added to party MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc.(pty:pla))(Pancer, Gary) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Rodney Tuttle served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Massoudi, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Guille E. Tuttle served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Massoudi, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Leslie Adams served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leslie Adams personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Massoudi, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant David Grundies served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Grundies personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Massoudi, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Greg MacNeil served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Greg MacNeil personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Massoudi, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Get Engineering Corporation served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cathy Ashby, Receptionist, Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Massoudi, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Appearance #16 United States of America. (Canter, Charles) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Charles E Canter on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Canter, Charles) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Leslie Adams, Get Engineering Corporation, David Grundies, Greg MacNeil, Guille E. Tuttle, Rodney Tuttle. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Order Unsealing Case,, #13 , Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff-Relator MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc.. (Massoudi, Kevin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE ELECTION BY THE UNITED STATES TO DECLINE INTERVENTION AND PARTIAL UNSEALING OF CASE by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the seal is lifted from this action in all respects. The Complaint #1 is UNSEALED and the relator shall serve it upon the defendants; This Order and the Notice of Election by the United States to Decline Intervention and Stipulation Re Partial unsealing of Case #12 are both UNSEALED. All other contents of the Court's file in this action, filed and lodged to date, shall remain permanently under seal and shall not be made public or served upon any defendant or other party or person. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ELECTION by the United States to Decline Intervention and Stipulation Re Partial Unsealing of Case. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). (jp) Modified on 3/1/2019 (jp). [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER EXTENDING SEAL AND UNITED STATES ELECTION PERIOD by Judge Josephine L. Staton (es) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support Stipulation Requesting Extension of Seal and United States' Dlection Period #9 ; Declaration of Charles E Canter in support thereof filed by plaintiff United States of America. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION Requesting Extension of Seal and Government's Election Period filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order). (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Extending Seal and United States' Election Period by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation for Order #6 . (dro) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Stipulation #6 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (dro) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION Requesting Extension of Seal and United States' Election Period filed by plaintiff United States of America.(dro) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc., re Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 , Complaint - (Discovery), #1 served on 03/21/2018. (dro) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by plaintiff MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IXI Technology, Inc. for MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Leslie Adams, Get Engineering Corporation, David Grundies, Greg MacNeil, Guille E. Tuttle, Rodney Tuttle.Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, (Filing fee $ 400 paid) Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc., United States of America. (Attachments: #1 part 2) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Get Engineering Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MC2 Sabtech Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: James M Carter
Represented By: Aaron S. Dyer
Represented By: Todd John Canni
Represented By: Kevin Reza Massoudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Charles E Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rodney Tuttle
Represented By: Michael P McCloskey
Represented By: Adam Le Berthon
Represented By: David J Aveni
Represented By: Gary Scott Pancer
Represented By: Scott T Tropio
Represented By: William C Pate
Represented By: William Christopher Pate
Represented By: Susan Leslie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Guille E. Tuttle
Represented By: Michael P McCloskey
Represented By: Adam Le Berthon
Represented By: David J Aveni
Represented By: Gary Scott Pancer
Represented By: Scott T Tropio
Represented By: William C Pate
Represented By: William Christopher Pate
Represented By: Susan Leslie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg MacNeil
Represented By: Michael P McCloskey
Represented By: Adam Le Berthon
Represented By: David J Aveni
Represented By: Gary Scott Pancer
Represented By: Scott T Tropio
Represented By: William C Pate
Represented By: William Christopher Pate
Represented By: Susan Leslie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Grundies
Represented By: Michael P McCloskey
Represented By: Adam Le Berthon
Represented By: David J Aveni
Represented By: Gary Scott Pancer
Represented By: Scott T Tropio
Represented By: William C Pate
Represented By: William Christopher Pate
Represented By: Susan Leslie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leslie Adams
Represented By: Michael P McCloskey
Represented By: Adam Le Berthon
Represented By: David J Aveni
Represented By: Gary Scott Pancer
Represented By: Scott T Tropio
Represented By: William C Pate
Represented By: William Christopher Pate
Represented By: Susan Leslie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Get Engineering Corporation
Represented By: Michael P McCloskey
Represented By: Adam Le Berthon
Represented By: David J Aveni
Represented By: Gary Scott Pancer
Represented By: Scott T Tropio
Represented By: William C Pate
Represented By: William Christopher Pate
Represented By: Susan Leslie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?