Lewis v. Khan
Plaintiff: Brian Lewis
Defendant: Alan Khan
Case Number: 3:2019cv01254
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
2 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motions to Proceed in Forma Pauperis [ECF Nos. #2 , #4 ]; and Dismissing Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.9 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b)(1). The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/20/2019. (A copy of this order was mailed to Ralph Diaz, Secretary) (A complaint under the Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. 1983 form mailed to the Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jao).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Nita L. Stormes, to the calendar of the Honorable Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. All pending dates including discovery deadlines, hearings, and conferences before Magistrate Judge Stormes, if any, remain unchanged until further order and are now set before Magistrate Allison H. Goddard. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 19cv1254-WQH-NLS. Signed by Magistate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/8/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) Modified on 8/9/2019 to change name of the judge who signed the order (ag).
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Lewis. (jms)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge William Q. Hayes Accepting Document: Motion to Proceed IFP, from Plaintiff Brian Lewis. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Duplicate document, previously filed (See ECF No. #2 ). Nunc Pro Tunc 7/18/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/19/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Lewis. (jms) (jao).
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Alan Khan, filed by Brian Lewis.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1254-WQH. Judge William Q. Hayes is assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?