Leonard Eugene Ward v. M. H. Valadez et al
Plaintiff: Leonard Eugene Ward
Defendant: G. Bowen, M. H. Valadez, Armando Favila, R Martinez, R Johnson, A. Taylor-Garcia, J Galindo, M. Voong, C Griffin, J Denault, L. Santana, K J Allen, Deputy A. Alfaro and M. Palacio
Case Number: 3:2019cv01267
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on #47 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must file his opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before 9/30/2019. Defendants shall file any reply brief on or before 10/15/2019. Unless the Court directs otherwise in advance, this matter will be resolved without oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/12/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
August 9, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by A. Alfaro(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CRRA), individual), G. Bowen(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CCRA), individual), J Denault(Correctional Captain/Chairperson of Classifacation Committee, individual), Armando Favila(Chief Deputy Warden, individual), J Galindo, C Griffin(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), R Johnson(Associate Warden-Central Services (A), official capacity), R Martinez(Correctional Case Record Administrator (CCRA), individual), M. Palacio(Records Analyst-Supervisor, official capacity), L. Santana, A. Taylor-Garcia(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), M. H. Valadez(Correctional Case Records Supervisor (CCRS), individual). (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Findley, Christopher)Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party A. Alfaro(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party G. Bowen(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party J Denault(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party Armando Favila(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party J Galindo(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party C Griffin(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party R Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party R Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party M. Palacio(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party L. Santana(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party A. Taylor-Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher H Findley added to party M. H. Valadez(pty:dft) (tcf).
August 9, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by A. Taylor-Garcia(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), R Johnson(Associate Warden-Central Services (A), official capacity), G. Bowen(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CCRA), individual), M. Palacio(Records Analyst-Supervisor, official capacity), C Griffin(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), individual), M. H. Valadez(Correctional Case Records Supervisor (CCRS), official capacity), A. Alfaro(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CRRA), individual), J Galindo, J Denault(Correctional Captain/Chairperson of Classifacation Committee, official capacity) Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support; Defendants Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Findley, Christopher) (jdt).
August 9, 2019 Filing 45 ***WITHDRAWN per ECF #46 *** MOTION to Dismiss by A. Alfaro(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CRRA), individual), G. Bowen(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CCRA), individual), J Denault(Correctional Captain/Chairperson of Classifacation Committee, individual), Armando Favila(Chief Deputy Warden, individual), J Galindo, C Griffin(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), R Johnson(Associate Warden-Central Services (A), individual), R Martinez(Correctional Case Record Administrator (CCRA), official capacity), M. Palacio(Records Analyst-Supervisor, official capacity), L. Santana, A. Taylor-Garcia(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), M. H. Valadez(Correctional Case Records Supervisor (CCRS), individual). (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proof of Service)(Tangonan, Jon)Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party A. Alfaro(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party G. Bowen(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party J Denault(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party Armando Favila(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party J Galindo(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party C Griffin(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party R Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party R Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party M. Palacio(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party L. Santana(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party A. Taylor-Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Jon S. Tangonan added to party M. H. Valadez(pty:dft). Modified on 8/12/2019 to withdraw. Terminated motion and judge association (jdt).
July 10, 2019 Filing 43 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:18-cv-01903. Original file received electronically
July 9, 2019 Filing 44 Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that defendants' Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer (docket no. #22 ) is GRANTED insofar as defendants alternatively move to transfer this case to a jurisdiction with proper venue, and this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym Objections to R&R due by 5/17/2019 (kca) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Plaintiff Ward or to Transfer #22 , Complaint - (Referred),,,,,,, #1 (kca) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 39 DECLARATION OF LEONARD EUGENE WARD in Support of his Opposition to Defendant's Motion to dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 38 OPPOSITION to: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Plaintiff Ward or to Transfer #22 filed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant G. Bowen served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Bungart/office Tech. and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant J. Galindo served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Bungart/office Tech. and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant L. Santana served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Bungart/office Tech. and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant A. Taylor-Garcia served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon by serving Brandon self/CC2 Litigiation and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant R. Martinez served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Bungart/office Tech. and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant C. Griffin served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Bungart/office Tech. and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant A. Alfaro served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Bungart/office Tech. and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant M. Palacio served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon by serving Brandon self/CC2 Litigiation and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant K. J. Allen served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon M. Voong by serving Stringer/Clerk Legal Affairs and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant K. J. Allen served on 12/18/2018, answer due 12/29/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robin Stringer/Clerk Legal Affairs and Auth. Agent to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant R. Johnson served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Bungart/office Tech. and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant Armando Favila served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Bungart/office Tech. and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant M. H. Valadez served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Bungart/office Tech. and auth. agent to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward, upon Defendant J. Denault served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhonda Bungart/office Tech. and auth. agent to accept service of process. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order Setting Motion to Dismiss or Transfer #22 Briefing Schedule. Plaintiffs opposition, or notice of non-opposition, to the motion to dismiss or transfer must be served and filed on or before January 18, 2019. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (kca) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Plaintiff Ward or to Transfer filed by Defendants A. Alfaro(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CRRA), individual), A. Alfaro(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CRRA), official capacity), K. J. Allen(Appeals Examiner, Office of Appeals, official capacity), K. J. Allen(Appeals Examiner, Office of Appeals, individual), G. Bowen(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CCRA), individual), G. Bowen(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CCRA), official capacity), J. Denault(Correctional Captain/Chairperson of Classifacation Committee, individual), J. Denault(Correctional Captain/Chairperson of Classifacation Committee, official capacity), Armando Favila(Chief Deputy Warden, individual), Armando Favila(Chief Deputy Warden, official capacity), J. Galindo, C. Griffin(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), C. Griffin(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), individual), R. Johnson(Associate Warden-Central Services (A), official capacity), R. Johnson(Associate Warden-Central Services (A), individual), R. Martinez(Correctional Case Record Administrator (CCRA), individual), R. Martinez(Correctional Case Record Administrator (CCRA), official capacity), M. Palacio(Records Analyst-Supervisor, official capacity), M. Palacio(Records Analyst-Supervisor, individual), L. Santana, A. Taylor-Garcia(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), A. Taylor-Garcia(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), individual), M. H. Valadez(Correctional Case Records Supervisor (CCRS), individual), M. H. Valadez(Correctional Case Records Supervisor (CCRS), official capacity), M. Voong(Chief, Office Appeals, official capacity), M. Voong(Chief, Office Appeals, individual). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shaff, Colin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants A. Alfaro(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CRRA), individual), A. Alfaro(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CRRA), official capacity), K. J. Allen(Appeals Examiner, Office of Appeals, official capacity), K. J. Allen(Appeals Examiner, Office of Appeals, individual), G. Bowen(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CCRA), individual), G. Bowen(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CCRA), official capacity), J. Denault(Correctional Captain/Chairperson of Classifacation Committee, individual), J. Denault(Correctional Captain/Chairperson of Classifacation Committee, official capacity), Armando Favila(Chief Deputy Warden, individual), Armando Favila(Chief Deputy Warden, official capacity), J. Galindo, C. Griffin(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), C. Griffin(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), individual), R. Johnson(Associate Warden-Central Services (A), official capacity), R. Johnson(Associate Warden-Central Services (A), individual), R. Martinez(Correctional Case Record Administrator (CCRA), individual), R. Martinez(Correctional Case Record Administrator (CCRA), official capacity), M. Palacio(Records Analyst-Supervisor, official capacity), M. Palacio(Records Analyst-Supervisor, individual), L. Santana, A. Taylor-Garcia(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), A. Taylor-Garcia(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), individual), M. H. Valadez(Correctional Case Records Supervisor (CCRS), individual), M. H. Valadez(Correctional Case Records Supervisor (CCRS), official capacity), M. Voong(Chief, Office Appeals, official capacity), M. Voong(Chief, Office Appeals, individual), identifying M. Palacio; M. Voong; A. Alfaro; M. Valadez; J. Denault; K. Allen; C. Griffin; A. Taylor-Garcia; R. Johnson; L. Santana; A. Favila; R. Martinez; G. Bowen; J. Galindo; The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation; and The State of California.. (Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party A. Alfaro(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party A. Alfaro(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party K. J. Allen(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party K. J. Allen(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party G. Bowen(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party G. Bowen(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party J. Denault(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party J. Denault(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party Armando Favila(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party Armando Favila(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party J. Galindo(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party C. Griffin(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party C. Griffin(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party R. Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party R. Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party R. Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party R. Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party M. Palacio(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party M. Palacio(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party L. Santana(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party A. Taylor-Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party A. Taylor-Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party M. H. Valadez(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party M. H. Valadez(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party M. Voong(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Shaff added to party M. Voong(pty:dft))(Shaff, Colin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant R. Johnson. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant M. H. Valadez.(sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant J. Denault. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant G. Bowen. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant J. Galindo. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant L. Santana. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant A. Taylor-Garcia. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant R. Martinez.(sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant C. Griffin. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant M. Palacio.(sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant M. Voong. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant Armando Favila. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant K. J. Allen. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred),, #1 as to Defendant A. Alfaro. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TIME LIMIT FOR SERVING COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym(SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400.00 filing fee from Leonard Eugene Ward. Re: Order on Request re Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93), #4 . Receipt number RS009687. (aco) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, DENYING #2 Notice of Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (es) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants A. Alfaro(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CRRA), individual), A. Alfaro(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CRRA), official capacity), K. J. Allen(Appeals Examiner, Office of Appeals, official capacity), K. J. Allen(Appeals Examiner, Office of Appeals, individual), G. Bowen(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CCRA), individual), G. Bowen(Correctional Case Records Administrator (CCRA), official capacity), J. Denault(Correctional Captain/Chairperson of Classifacation Committee, individual), J. Denault(Correctional Captain/Chairperson of Classifacation Committee, official capacity), Armando Favila(Chief Deputy Warden, individual), Armando Favila(Chief Deputy Warden, official capacity), J. Galindo, C. Griffin(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), C. Griffin(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), individual), R. Johnson(Associate Warden-Central Services (A), official capacity), R. Johnson(Associate Warden-Central Services (A), individual), R. Martinez(Correctional Case Record Administrator (CCRA), individual), R. Martinez(Correctional Case Record Administrator (CCRA), official capacity), M. Palacio(Records Analyst-Supervisor, official capacity), M. Palacio(Records Analyst-Supervisor, individual), L. Santana, A. Taylor-Garcia(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), official capacity), A. Taylor-Garcia(Correctional Counselor I (CCI), individual), M. H. Valadez(Correctional Case Records Supervisor (CCRS), individual), M. H. Valadez(Correctional Case Records Supervisor (CCRS), official capacity), M. Voong(Chief, Office Appeals, official capacity) Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym., filed by Plaintiff Leonard Eugene Ward. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Civil Rights Complaint) (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard Eugene Ward v. M. H. Valadez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Bowen
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. H. Valadez
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Favila
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Martinez
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Johnson
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Taylor-Garcia
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Galindo
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Griffin
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Denault
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Santana
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K J Allen
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy A. Alfaro
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Palacio
Represented By: Colin A Shaff
Represented By: Christopher H Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Eugene Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?