Gjerman v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lori Gjerman
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc. and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01272
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Houston
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lori Gjerman of Eighth Cause Of Action for Violation of Title 15 U.S.C. 1641(g) ONLY (Cara, Tony) (tcf).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. The Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 9/23/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. The Case Management Conference is set for 9/23/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. The Joint Discovery Plan is due 9/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/14/2019. (tcf) (jao).
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Warner, Steven) (tcf).
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lori Gjerman as to Defendant FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, INC., only (Cara, Tony) (tcf).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants may file their responsive pleading on or before August 16, 2019. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/17/2019. (tcf) (jao).
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, to August 16, 2019 by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Warner, Steven) (tcf).
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY DALAR ABOLIAN by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Warner, Steven) (tcf).
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P. Warner on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Warner, Steven)Attorney Steven P. Warner added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:dft) (tcf).
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, of Dalar Abolian by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Abolian, Dalar) (tcf).
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Nationstar Mortgage LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, . Identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent KKR Wand Investors Corporation, Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Abolian, Dalar) (tcf) (dsn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent KKR Wand Investors Corporation, Corporate Parent WMIH Corp. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Abolian, Dalar) (tcf).
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC of case(s) None re #1 Notice of Removal, Identifying No Related Cases. (Abolian, Dalar) (tcf).
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California County of San Diego, North County District, case number 37-2019-00027322-CU-BC-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12707670.), filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc., DOES 1-10, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 SDSC summons and complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01272-JAH-BLM. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(als) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gjerman v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Inc.
Represented By: Dalar Abolian
Represented By: Steven P. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Dalar Abolian
Represented By: Steven P. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Gjerman
Represented By: Anthony Cara
Represented By: Tony Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?