Bruins v. Whitman et al
Plaintiff: Andrew David Bruins, II
Defendant: M. Whitman, A. Acevedo and J Jimenez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01278
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against J Jimenez, M. Whitman, filed by Andrew David Bruins, II. (jms)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Accepting Document: First Amended Complaint, from Plaintiff Andrew David Bruins, II. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Not timely per Order dated 7/22/2019 (ECF No. #4 ). Nunc Pro Tunc 8/28/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/29/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is directed to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by garnishing monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Court dismisses Plaintiff's Complaint for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b) and grants 30 days leave from the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/22/2019. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) (Blank 1983 Amended Complaint form t/w copy of this Order mailed to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (sjt).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of GO 653A Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Accepting re #1 Complaint,, from Plaintiff Andrew David Bruins, II. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Initial case filings (42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, etc.) received by U.S. Mail and not properly e-filed in accordance with S.D. Cal. General Order 653A.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/11/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew David Bruins, II. (jms) (dsn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against A. Acevedo, M. Whitman, filed by Andrew David Bruins, II.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1278-BAS. Judge Cynthia Bashant is assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruins v. Whitman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew David Bruins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?