Vista Capital Investments, LLC v. Natural Shrimp, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vista Capital Investments, LLC
Defendant: Natural Shrimp, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01302
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: M James Lorenz
2 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
3 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Natural Shrimp, Inc.. (David, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Vista Capital Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A - Original Petition Dallas, #3 Exhibit B - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice, #4 Exhibit C- Natural Shrimp's Complaint)(Sbaiti, Mazin)(ag).
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Errata to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Vista Capital Investments, LLC re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Sbaiti, Mazin) (ag).
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Vista Capital Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A Original Petition Dallas, #3 Exhibit B Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice, #4 Exhibit C Natural Shrimp's Complaint)(Sbaiti, Mazin) (tcf).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 9/18/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/30/2019.(ag)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1302-WQH-BGS. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/24/2019. Motions set before Bernard G. Skomal.(ag)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Natural Shrimp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration, #4 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(David, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey M. David added to party Natural Shrimp, Inc.(pty:dft) (ag).
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Vista Capital Investments, LLC of case(s) 3:19-cv-01239 re #1 Complaint, . (Sbaiti, Mazin) (ag).
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vista Capital Investments, LLC, as to Natural Shrimp, Inc.. (Sbaiti, Mazin) (ag).
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Natural Shrimp, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Simon, Joshua)Attorney Joshua G. Simon added to party Natural Shrimp, Inc.(pty:dft)(sjt).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (jao).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Natural Shrimp, Inc. filed by Vista Capital Investments, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12719209). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1302-L-AGS. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Sbaiti, Mazin)(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vista Capital Investments, LLC v. Natural Shrimp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Shrimp, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua G. Simon
Represented By: Jeffrey M. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vista Capital Investments, LLC
Represented By: Mazin A. Sbaiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?