Bank of America National Association v. German et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America National Association
Defendant: Gloria Bernice German, All Occupants, Debra Bell and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 3:2019cv01310
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Remand. This action is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California for the County of San Diego. Germans incomplete motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED AS MOOT (ECF No. #2 ). Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/26/2019. (All non-registered users served via US Mail Service and Certified copy sent to State Court via US Mail Service.) (tcf) (sjt).
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Gloria Bernice German re #3 Order to Show Cause. (tcf)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document: Reply to Order to Show Cause, from Defendant Gloria Bernice German, also known as Debra Bell. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Improper format. The document unnecessarily attaches Bells birth certificate, and does not allege the parties state citizenship as ordered. Nunc Pro Tunc 7/25/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/26/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #1 Stricken Document - Exhibit A) (tcf).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Remand. Bell must file a copy of the complaint in the docket, no later than the close of business on Thursday, 7/25/2019. She must also file a supplemental notice of removal alleging the citizenship of all the parties, no later than Monday, 7/29/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/17/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gloria Bernice German. (smd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00024064-CL-UD-CTL filed by Gloria Bernice German (IFP Filed). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1310-LAB-MDD. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America National Association v. German et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Bernice German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Occupants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?