Faulkner v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Phillip Faulkner
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01323
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF SUSAN L. METER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD by Phillip Faulkner (Meter, Susan) (jrm).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Doc. #7 ]. Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 10/1/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/12/2019. (jrm) (jao).
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Maguire on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maguire, Daniel)Attorney Daniel W. Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (jrm).
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America to File Response to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marr, Nancy)Attorney Nancy Jerian Marr added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (jrm).
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Faulkner. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (Chandler, Corinne) (jao).
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan L Meter on behalf of Phillip Faulkner (Meter, Susan)Attorney Susan L Meter added to party Phillip Faulkner(pty:pla) (jao).
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn R. Kantor on behalf of Phillip Faulkner (Kantor, Glenn)Attorney Glenn R. Kantor added to party Phillip Faulkner(pty:pla) (jao).
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (jao).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Phillip Faulkner. No Parties With Financial Interest. (smd)(jao).
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Phillip Faulkner (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12728946). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1323-W-JLB. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Chandler, Corinne)(smd) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulkner v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Nancy Jerian Marr
Represented By: Daniel W. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Faulkner
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Represented By: Susan L Meter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?