Petitte v. Maxim et al
Petitioner: Mrs. Ana Pilar Petitte
Respondent: Melissa Maxim and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv01330
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: M James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
2 Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1421
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge John A. Houston is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1330-L-AGS.(no document attached) (jmo)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1330-JAH-AGS.(no document attached) (jmo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION against Melissa Maxim and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Ana Pilar Petitte (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12724063). (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1330-W-AGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Keppi, Camille)(smd) (sjt). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/18/2019) (smd). Modified on 7/18/2019 (smd).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION against Melissa Maxim and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Ana Pilar Petitte (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12724063). (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1330-W-AGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Keppi, Camille)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petitte v. Maxim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa Maxim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mrs. Ana Pilar Petitte
Represented By: Camille Marie Keppi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?