Coffin et al v. Magellan HRSC, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christie Coffin, Kimberly Willmott and Brenda Kasaty
Defendant: Magellan HRSC, Inc. and Does 1 to 100
Case Number: 3:2019cv01337
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332lr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Defendant's ex parte motion to vacate Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/12/2019. (jpp)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Ex Parte Application to Continue or, in the Alternative Vacate the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Confernece by Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration)(Mashouf, Fatemeh) (jpp).
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Action or, in th Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit Table of Contents, #6 Exhibit Exh. A - Court Docket, #7 Exhibit Exh. B - First Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exh. C. - Court's Memorandum, #9 Exhibit Exh. D. - Consent, #10 Exhibit Exh. E - Consent, #11 Exhibit Exh. F. - Consent, #12 Exhibit Exh. G - Second Amended Complaint)(Mashouf, Fatemeh) (jpp).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: (1) Granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion to appear telephonically for Early Neutral Evaluation Conferenc; (2) Setting Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/08/2019. (jpp)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Plaintiffs Motion to Appear Telephonically for ENE Conference by Christie Coffin, Brenda Kasaty, Kimberly Willmott re #6 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, (Attachments: #1 Declaration MTN to allow Plaintiffs to appear telephonically at ENE, #2 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Ostroff, Sheldon) (jpp).
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Magellan HRSC, Inc. re #3 Notice of Related Case, #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, (Mashouf, Fatemeh) (jpp).
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lodgment of State Court Record by Magellan HRSC, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Mashouf, Fatemeh)Attorney Fatemeh Sadat Mashouf added to party Magellan HRSC, Inc. (pty:dft) (jpp).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/20/2019 02:30pm before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/18/2019.(jpp) Modified on 7/19/2019 to edit Judge info. (jpp).
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Magellan HRSC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Magellan HRSC, Inc., Corporate Parent Merit Behavioral Care Corporation, Corporate Parent Magellan Healthcare, Inc., Corporate Parent Magellan Health, Inc. for Magellan HRSC, Inc... (Curtis, Mara) (jpp).
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Magellan HRSC, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Magellan HRSC, Inc., Corporate Parent Merit Behavioral Care Corporation, Corporate Parent Magellan Healthcare, Inc., Corporate Parent Magellan Health, Inc. for Magellan HRSC, Inc.. (Curtis, Mara) (jpp).
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Magellan HRSC, Inc. of case(s) 1:17-cv-00773-LF-KK . (Curtis, Mara) (jpp).
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Magellan HRSC, Inc. (smd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00030724-CU-OE-CTL filed by Magellan HRSC, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12733522). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1337-JLS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffin et al v. Magellan HRSC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Coffin
Represented By: Sheldon A Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Willmott
Represented By: Sheldon A Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Kasaty
Represented By: Sheldon A Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magellan HRSC, Inc.
Represented By: Mara D. Curtis
Represented By: Fatemeh Sadat Mashouf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?