Politte v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Allen Politte
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01506
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405id
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Parker on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft) (mme).
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE , Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by David Allen Politte (Barasch, Stuart) *QC Mailer sent re: filed in paper with signatures* (mme).
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Politte. Commissioner of Social Security served. (Barasch, Stuart) (mme).
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Consent/Declination Form has not been received by the Clerks Office. Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford is no longer assigned as presiding judge. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1506-BEN-KSC.(no document attached) (sjt)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Lahey on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Lahey, Sharon)Attorney Sharon Lahey added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft) mme).
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 application to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/14/2019. (jpp)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties by David Allen Politte (Barasch, Stuart) (ag).
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document #4 by David Allen Politte (Barasch, Stuart) (ag).
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER DOCUMENT NO. #5 - NOTICE of Interested Parties by David Allen Politte (Barasch, Stuart) emailed atty to refile a flattened image of this document (ag). Modified on 8/15/2019 to note that this document is withdrawn (ag).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Allen Politte. (Barasch, Stuart) (ag).
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Karen S. Crawford has been randomly assigned to 19-cv-01506-KSC. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. (jmo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number Due.), filed by David Allen Politte. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01506-KSC. Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford is assigned to the case. (Barasch, Stuart)(jmo) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Politte v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Politte
Represented By: Stuart Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Sharon Lahey
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?