United States of America v. 1.84 Acres of Land et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Imperial County Tax Collector, Alice M. Johnson, 1.84 Acres of Land, The Estate of or unknown Heirs of Harold H. Johnson, Deceased and Imperial Irrigation District
Case Number: 3:2019cv01507
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
2 Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Deposit Funds. The Ex Parte Application To Deposit Funds filed by the United States (ECF No. #5 ), the motion is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/20/2019. (ag)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #5 Ex Parte MOTION to Deposit Funds (supplemental declaration regarding attempts to contact defendants) by Plaintiff United States of America. (Wolak, Devin) (ag).
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19CV1507-WQH-AHG.(no document attached) (sjt)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by United States of America of case(s) 19-1509, 19-1513, 19-1515 . (Wolak, Devin) (jrm).
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION to Deposit Funds by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in support of Ex Parte Application)(Wolak, Devin) (jrm).
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Condemnation by United States of America (Wolak, Devin) (jrm).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Taking by Plaintiff United States of America. (Wolak, Devin) (jrm).
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1.84 Acres of Land, Imperial County Tax Collector, Imperial Irrigation District, Alice M. Johnson, The Estate of or unknown Heirs of Harold H. Johnson, No Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit -Schedule A, #3 Exhibit -Schedule B, #4 Exhibit -Schedule C, #5 Exhibit -Schedule D, #6 Exhibit -Schedule E, #7 Exhibit -Schedule F, #8 Exhibit -Schedule G)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01507-W-AHG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Wolak, Devin)(jxv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 1.84 Acres of Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial County Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.84 Acres of Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of or unknown Heirs of Harold H. Johnson, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Irrigation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Devin Andrew Wolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?