United States of America v. 7.55 Acres of Land et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: John C. Donlevy Co., 7.55 Acres of Land, Imperial County Tax Collector and Imperial Irrigation District
Case Number: 3:2019cv01509
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
2 Judge: Marilyn L Huff
3 Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff, Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-01507-WQH-AHG. The new case number is 19cv1509-WQH-AHG. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/30/2019. (jah)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Ex Parte Motion to Deposit Funds. The Clerk is directed to deposit the sum of $11,300, tendered by the United States. Court notes that Plaintiff filed a notice of related cases #6 , but the low number rule order has not yet been signed. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/16/2019. (jah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by United States of America of case(s) 19cv1507-W(AHG), 19cv1513-JAH(KSC), 19cv1515-BAS(BGS). (Wolak, Devin). Modified on 8/15/2019 - Corrected text re related case numbers. Proposed Low Transfer Order prepared and forwarded (jah).
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION to Deposit Funds by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Wolak, Devin). (jah).
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Condemnation by United States of America (Wolak, Devin). (jah).
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Taking by Plaintiff United States of America. (Wolak, Devin). (jah).
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 7.55 Acres of Land, Imperial County Tax Collector, Imperial Irrigation District, John C. Donlevy Co., Fee Waived, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Schedule A - authority, #3 Schedule B - public purpose, #4 Schedule C - legal description, #5 Schedule D - map/plat, #6 Schedule E - estate taken, #7 Schedule F - estimate of just compensation, #8 Schedule G - names and addresses of interested parties)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01509-H-LL. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Wolak, Devin)(jmo) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 7.55 Acres of Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Donlevy Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.55 Acres of Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial County Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Irrigation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Devin Andrew Wolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?