Jones v. Elizalde et al
Plaintiff: Garland Jones
Defendant: Elizalde, Mr. Blahwick, Tiscornia, Mrs. Crim and Monet
Case Number: 3:2019cv01521
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that For the reasons set forth above, the Court: (1) DENIES Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed IFP (ECF No. 2) as barred by 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); (2) DISMISSES this civil action sua sponte without prejudice for failing to prepay the $400 civil and administrative filing fees required by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a); (3) CERTIFIES that an IFP appeal from this Order would be frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Case Closed. IT IS SO ORDERED.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)(sjt).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : (1) Denying Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis As Barred by 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) [ECF No. #2 ]; and (2) Dismissing Civil Action Without Prejudice for Failure to Pay Filing Fee Required by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a). Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/26/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Garland Jones. (tcf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Garland Jones. (tcf) (jao).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Blahwick, Crim, Elizalde, Monet, Tiscornia, filed by Garland Jones. ($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CDCR Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1521-CAB-JLB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Elizalde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Blahwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiscornia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Crim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garland Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?