Patenaude v. Meridian Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: Maria Patenaude
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, Meridian Financial Services and Royal Beach and Tennis Club
Case Number: 3:2019cv01548
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/30/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE Conference, a Case Management Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for October 30, 2019, and will be held at the conclusion of the ENE Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/24/2019.(jao)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiciton by Royal Beach and Tennis Club. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terrance K. Wallberg)(Kaminski, David) (jao).
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Meridian Financial Services.(Kaminski, David) (jao).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant must respond to the Complaint on or before Friday, September 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 9/3/2019. (jao)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Meridian Financial Services, Royal Beach and Tennis Club. (Kaminski, David) (jao).
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Meridian Financial Services, Royal Beach and Tennis Club. Identifying Corporate Parent Interval Resort & Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Meridian Financial Services. (jxv)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego County- San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-02019-00034178-CU-BT-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12840536.), filed by Meridian Financial Services, Royal Beach and Tennis Club. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01548-W-JLB. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jxv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patenaude v. Meridian Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Financial Services
Represented By: David J Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Beach and Tennis Club
Represented By: David J Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Patenaude
Represented By: Wade A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?