Webb v. Trader Joe's Company
Plaintiff: Christina Webb
Defendant: Trader Joe's Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01587
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant Trader Joe's Company's Notice of Motion and Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings filed by Trader Joe's Company. (Garganta, Angel) (anh).
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Yuhan Chi on behalf of Trader Joe's Company (Chi, Yuhan)Attorney Yuhan Chi added to party Trader Joe's Company(pty:dft) (anh).
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Christina Webb re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Marron, Ronald)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant Trader Joe's Company's Notice of Motion and Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings filed by Christina Webb. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proof of Service)(Marron, Ronald)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Vacating Notice and order for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/23/2019.(anh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Trader Joe's Company re #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant Trader Joe's Company's Notice of Motion and Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings Defendant Trader Joe's Company's Request For Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Defendant Trader Joe's Company's Request For Judicial Notice)(Garganta, Angel) (anh).
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant Trader Joe's Company's Notice of Motion and Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings by Trader Joe's Company. (Garganta, Angel) (anh).
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amit Rana on behalf of Trader Joe's Company (Rana, Amit)Attorney Amit Rana added to party Trader Joe's Company(pty:dft) (anh).
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Elliot on behalf of Christina Webb (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Elliot, David)Attorney David Elliot added to party Christina Webb(pty:pla) (anh).
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lilach Halperin on behalf of Christina Webb (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Halperin, Lilach)Attorney Lilach Halperin added to party Christina Webb(pty:pla) (anh).
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Houchin on behalf of Christina Webb (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Houchin, Michael)Attorney Michael Houchin added to party Christina Webb(pty:pla) (anh).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/10/2019.(anh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Trader Joe's Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Garganta, Angel) (Identifying T.A.C.T. Holding, Inc. as corporate parent to Trader Joe's)(anh).
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Trader Joe's Company. (als)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court for the State of California County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00035568-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12864768.), filed by Trader Joe's Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Defendant Trader Joe's Company's Notice of Removal of Act, #3 Exhibit 2 to Defendant Trader Joe's Company's Notice of Removal of Act, #4 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01587-CAB-WVG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(als) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Trader Joe's Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trader Joe's Company
Represented By: Angel A Garganta
Represented By: Amit Rana
Represented By: Yuhan Chi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Webb
Represented By: Ronald Marron
Represented By: Lilach Halperin
Represented By: Michael Houchin
Represented By: David Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?