Celgene Corporation v. Hetero Labs Limited et al
Plaintiff: Celgene Corporation
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Apotex Corp., Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., Hetero Labs Limited and Apotex, Inc.
Petitioner: Anthony Insogna and Dr. David A. Gay
Case Number: 3:2019cv01589
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: Allison H Goddard
3 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. re #8 Order,,, #10 Declaration,, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion to Quash (Schweitzer, Lauren) (jdt).
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion (Redacted Version) by Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Schweitzer, Lauren) (jdt).
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Quash (Redacted Version) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Schweitzer, Lauren) (jdt).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Requiring Briefing Regarding Defendants' Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Celgene Corporation shall either (1) advise the Court that it does not seek to have the documents sealed, or (2) file briefing in support of Defendants' motion to file documents under seal no later than 10/24/2019. Defendants shall serve a copy of this Order on counsel for Plaintiff, and shall file a Proof of Service in this action, no later than 10/17/2019. Defendants shall file a public, redacted version of their Opposition, declaration, and exhibits no later than 10/17/2019. Defendants shall serve a copy of the redacted version of their Opposition, declaration, and exhibits on counsel for Third Parties Anthony Insogna and David Gay, and shall file a Proof of Service in this action, no later than 10/17/2019. The briefing schedule set forth in ECF No. #4 remains in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 10/16/2019. (jdt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #6 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schweitzer, Lauren)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Schweitzer, Lauren)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David A. Gay, Anthony Insogna re #4 Order Setting Briefing Schedule (Geise, Steve). Modified on 9/23/2019 to add CM/ECF link (jdt).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (ECF No. 1 ): Third Parties shall serve a copy of this Order on counsel for Defendants, and shall file a Proof of Service in this action (see ECF No. 1-5), no later than 9/30/2019. Responses due by 10/15/2019 Replies due by 10/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 9/23/2019. (jdt)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER. It is ordered that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Bernard G. Skomal to the calendar of the Honorable Allison H.Goddard for all further proceedings. All pending dates including discovery deadlines, hearings, and conferences before Judge Skomal, if any, remain unchanged until further order and are now set before Judge Goddard. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 19cv1589-LAB-AHG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/18/2019. Motions set before Allison H. Goddard.(jdt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge The new case number is 19cv1589-LAB-BGS.(no document attached) (mme)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by David A. Gay, Anthony Insogna. (no document attached) (cdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celgene Corporation v. Hetero Labs Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Lauren J. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Insogna
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dr. David A. Gay
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celgene Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?