Nucleushealth, LLC v. Sharma et al
Plaintiff: Nucleushealth, LLC
Defendant: Subodh Sharma and DOES 1-101
Case Number: 3:2019cv01615
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/15/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Subodh Sharma.(anh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nucleushealth, LLC. Subodh Sharma served. (Stewart, Ian) (anh).
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (jao).
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-101, Subodh Sharma ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12875735.), filed by Nucleushealth, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1615-CAB-MDD. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Stewart, Ian)(smd) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nucleushealth, LLC v. Sharma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subodh Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nucleushealth, LLC
Represented By: Ian A. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?