Milini v. Maserati North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mauro Milini
Defendant: Maserati North America, Inc. and DOES 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2019cv01693
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management was held on 10/9/2019. The parties shall file a joint motion for protective order by 10/30/2019. Court notes the previously scheduled Early Neutral Evaluation set to occur 11/27/2019 9:30 AM. Pursuant to Court's Order #7 , the parties are required to submit confidential ENE statements to Chambers by 11/18/2019. All other guidelines and requirements remain in effect. Any motion to join other parties, to amend the pleadings, or to file additional pleadings must be filed by 12/6/2019. All other pretrial motions must be filed by 8/7/2020. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 5/4/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 10/12/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/10/2019. (jah)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Case Management Conference held on 10/9/2019. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Christian Scott). (Defendant Attorney Amy Frerich). (no document attached) (bxr)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IN PART JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #6 Motion to Continue The CMC will remain as set on 10/9/2019 at 1:30p.m. but will occur as an attorneys-only, telephonic CMC. The Court will initiate the call. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/9/2019 is continued to 11/27/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. The parties must submit updated confidential ENE statements to chambers by 11/18/2019. All other guidelines and requirements remain in effect. See ECF #4 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/7/2019. (sjm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Maserati North America, Inc.. (Frerich, Amy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Maserati North America, Inc. (Frerich, Amy)Attorney Amy Lynn Frerich added to party Maserati North America, Inc.(pty:dft)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/9/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. In the event the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will conduct an Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/11/2019. (jah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Maserati North America, Inc. Identifying Other Affiliate FCA US LLC, Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., a publicly held company, Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, formerly known as Fiat North for Maserati North America, Inc. (jmo) (jao).
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Maserati North America, Inc. (jmo) (jao).
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00040655-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12908041), filed by Maserati North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State court summons and complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State court cover sheet, #4 Exhibit C - State court proof of service, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01693-H-BLM. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(jmo) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milini v. Maserati North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauro Milini
Represented By: Christian S Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maserati North America, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Lee Nilsen
Represented By: Amy Lynn Frerich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?