Rosenstein, M.D. v. American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Rosenstein, M.D.
Defendant: American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery and American Board of Medical Specialties
Case Number: 3:2019cv01754
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
2 Judge: William V Gallo
3 Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0002at
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSOLIDATION ORDER for Pre-Trial Proceedings. Cases Consolidated, 19cv0341-L-RBB. All future docketing will be done in the lead case. The request of defendants for an extension of time to respond to the complaint is granted. Defendants shall file their responses to the complaint no later than 11/27/2019. To the extent any Defendants intend to respond with a motion to dismiss, they shall jointly file the motion together with one consolidated memorandum of points and authorities no later than 11/27/2019. In opposition, Plaintiffs shall jointly file one consolidated opposition brief. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/4/2019. (lrf)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of William K. McVisk, re #24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/21/2019.(rmc)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Daniel R. Formeller, re #23 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan for Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/21/2019.(rmc)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Katherine F. Letcher, re #25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan for Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/21/2019.(rmc)
October 21, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #14 Order to Show Cause, (joined by ABEM, ABOS, and ABA)) filed by American Board of Medical Specialties. (Cart, Jean-Paul)(sjt).
October 17, 2019 Filing 25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Letcher, Katherine) (dsn)
October 17, 2019 Filing 24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (McVisk, William) (dsn)
October 17, 2019 Filing 23 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Formeller, Daniel) (dsn)
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13065838.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Letcher, Katherine) QC email sent re missing signature. (dsn)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13065796.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (McVisk, William) QC email sent re missing signature (dsn).
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13065586.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Formeller, Daniel) QC email sent re missing signature. (dsn)
October 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION (of William K. McVisk) by American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery re #16 Notice of Appearance (Sozio, Michaela) (QC mailer sent re: improper event. Atty instructed to withdraw and refile)(sjt).
October 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION (of Katherine F. Letcher) by American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery re #16 Notice of Appearance (Sozio, Michaela) (QC mailer sent re: improper event. Atty instructed to withdraw and refile) (sjt).
October 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE Pro Hac Vice Application (of Daniel R. Formeller) by American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery re #16 Notice of Appearance (Sozio, Michaela) (QC mailer sent re: improper event. Atty instructed to withdraw and refile) (sjt).
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela Battista Sozio on behalf of American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery (Sozio, Michaela)Attorney Michaela Battista Sozio added to party American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery(pty:dft)(sjt).
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Alexander Rosenstein, M.D. re #14 Order to Show Cause,. (Medici, Carmen) (sjt).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Actions 19cv341 and 19cv1754 Should Not be Consolidated. Plaintiffs shall file a response no later than October 11, 2019. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order on all Defendants. No later than October 21, 2019, Defendants may, but are not required to, file a reply. In the absence of a timely response to this Order to Show Cause, the actions may be consolidated for all purposes. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/30/2019.(sjt)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo, Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-00341-L-RBB. The new case number is 19cv1754-L-RBB.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/24/2019.(anh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alexander Rosenstein, M.D., as to American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery. (Shingler, Arthur) (anh).
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alexander Rosenstein, M.D., as to American Board of Medical Specialties. (Shingler, Arthur) (anh).
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1754-CAB-WVG.(no document attached) (mme) Modified on 9/18/2019 New LNO prepared and sent to Chambers (dlg).
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William Q. Hayes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1754-BEN-WVG. Low-number Order recreated.(no document attached) (sjt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel is no longer assigned. Case randomly reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1754 WQH (WVG).(no document attached) (jcj) Modified on 9/16/2019 new LNO prepared and sent to Chambers (dlg).
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Alexander Rosenstein, M.D. of case(s) No. 2:18-CV-05260 (E.D. Pa.); No. 1:19-cv-01407 (N.D. Ill.); and No. 1:19-cv-01614 (N.D. Ill.) . (Medici, Carmen) (dlg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur L Shingler, III on behalf of Alexander Rosenstein, M.D. (Shingler, Arthur)Attorney Arthur L Shingler, III added to party Alexander Rosenstein, M.D.(pty:pla) (dlg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen A. Medici on behalf of Alexander Rosenstein, M.D. (Medici, Carmen)Attorney Carmen A. Medici added to party Alexander Rosenstein, M.D.(pty:pla) (dlg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Alexander Rosenstein, M.D. of case(s) 3:19-cv-00341-L-RBB (S.D. Cal.) . (Mitchell, David) Modified on 9/12/2019 proposed LNO prepared and sent to Chambers (dlg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Alexander Rosenstein, M.D. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Mitchell, David) (dlg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjm) (jao).
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Board of Medical Specialties, American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12931070), filed by Alexander Rosenstein, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1754-GPC-WVG. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (David W. Mitchell)(sjm) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/12/2019) (sjm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 to replace documents without headers(sjm). (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenstein, M.D. v. American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Rosenstein, M.D.
Represented By: Arthur L Shingler, III
Represented By: Carmen A. Medici
Represented By: David William Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Board of Orthopaedic Surgery
Represented By: William K. McVisk
Represented By: Michaela Battista Sozio
Represented By: Daniel R. Formeller
Represented By: Katherine F. Letcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Board of Medical Specialties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?