Dare v. Nam et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dare
Defendant: Inku Nam, Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP and Nationstar Mortgage, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01765
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: John A Houston
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate NSM Holdings, Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation, Other Affiliate Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, Inc. (Warner, Steven) (tcf).
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Michael Dare. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/21/2019. (tcf)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Document: Motion for Permission for Electronic Filing, from Plaintiff Michael Dare. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/21/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tcf)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 Demand to Strike Defendant's Pleadings from the Record re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) by Michael Dare. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/21/2019. (tcf)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Document: Demand to Strike Defendant's pleading, from Plaintiff Michael Dare. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Improper format. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/22/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tcf)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Demand to Strike Defendant's Pleadings from the Record re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, Motion for a more Definite Statement by Michael Dare. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/21/2019. (tcf)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Document: Demand to Strike Defendant's Pleading, from Plaintiff Michael Dare. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Improper format. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/22/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael Dare as to Inku Nam. (tcf)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael Dare as to Inku Nam. (tcf)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael Dare as to Inku Nam. (tcf)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Dare. Nationstar Mortgage, Inc served. (tcf)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Dare. Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP served. (tcf)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Nationstar Mortgage, Inc re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-16, #2 Proof of Service By Overnight Delivery on Pro Se Plaintiff)(Warner, Steven) (tcf).
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) by Nationstar Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by Overnight Delivery on Pro Se Plaintiff, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Proof of Service by Overnight Delivery on Pro Se Plaintiff)(Warner, Steven)Attorney Steven P. Warner added to party Nationstar Mortgage, Inc(pty:dft) (tcf).
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Errata to Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint or, in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement by Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP, Inku Nam re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, Motion for a more Definite Statement (Vigil, Darlene) QC mailer sent re: No provision for Notice of Errata (tcf).
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, (Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint) by Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP, Inku Nam, Nationstar Mortgage, Inc. (Vigil, Darlene) (tcf).
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, Motion for a more Definite Statement by Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP, Inku Nam, Nationstar Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 10)(Vigil, Darlene)Attorney Darlene C Vigil added to party Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Darlene C Vigil added to party Inku Nam(pty:dft), Attorney Darlene C Vigil added to party Nationstar Mortgage, Inc(pty:dft) (tcf).
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (sxa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP, Inku Nam, Nationstar Mortgage, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS115171.), filed by Michael Dare. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01765-JAH-MSB. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Dare, Michael)(sxa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dare v. Nam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inku Nam
Represented By: Darlene C Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP
Represented By: Darlene C Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, Inc
Represented By: Steven P. Warner
Represented By: Darlene C Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?