Goldstein et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Julian Wilder, Percy Sutton, Rafael Martinez, Matt Goldstein, Gladys Tubbs, Lana Savage and Kendra Piazza
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01778
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
2 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332mv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha K. Monesi on behalf of Matt Goldstein, Rafael Martinez, Kendra Piazza, Lana Savage, Percy Sutton, Gladys Tubbs, Julian Wilder (Monesi, Trisha)Attorney Trisha K. Monesi added to party Matt Goldstein(pty:pla), Attorney Trisha K. Monesi added to party Rafael Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Trisha K. Monesi added to party Kendra Piazza(pty:pla), Attorney Trisha K. Monesi added to party Lana Savage(pty:pla), Attorney Trisha K. Monesi added to party Percy Sutton(pty:pla), Attorney Trisha K. Monesi added to party Gladys Tubbs(pty:pla), Attorney Trisha K. Monesi added to party Julian Wilder(pty:pla) (jdt).
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tarek H. Zohdy on behalf of Matt Goldstein, Rafael Martinez, Kendra Piazza, Lana Savage, Percy Sutton, Gladys Tubbs, Julian Wilder (Zohdy, Tarek)Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Matt Goldstein(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Rafael Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Kendra Piazza(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Lana Savage(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Percy Sutton(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Gladys Tubbs(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Julian Wilder(pty:pla) (jdt).
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody R. Padgett on behalf of Matt Goldstein, Rafael Martinez, Kendra Piazza, Lana Savage, Percy Sutton, Gladys Tubbs, Julian Wilder (Padgett, Cody)Attorney Cody R. Padgett added to party Matt Goldstein(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R. Padgett added to party Rafael Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R. Padgett added to party Kendra Piazza(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R. Padgett added to party Lana Savage(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R. Padgett added to party Percy Sutton(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R. Padgett added to party Gladys Tubbs(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R. Padgett added to party Julian Wilder(pty:pla) (jdt).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Allyson M. McKinstry, re #15 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/1/2019.(rmc)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by 11/22/2019. Defendant General Motors LLC must file answer to the Complaint by 1/10/2020. Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants motion to dismiss shall be due by 2/14/2020. Defendant's reply in support of its motion to dismiss shall be due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/1/2019. (jah)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Richard Weinmann on behalf of Matt Goldstein, Rafael Martinez, Kendra Piazza, Lana Savage, Percy Sutton, Gladys Tubbs, Julian Wilder (Weinmann, Steven)Attorney Steven Richard Weinmann added to party Matt Goldstein(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Richard Weinmann added to party Rafael Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Richard Weinmann added to party Kendra Piazza(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Richard Weinmann added to party Lana Savage(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Richard Weinmann added to party Percy Sutton(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Richard Weinmann added to party Gladys Tubbs(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Richard Weinmann added to party Julian Wilder(pty:pla)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (McKinstry, Allyson) (rmc).
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13109811.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (McKinstry, Allyson) QC mail sent on 10/30/2019 re missing signatures, instructed to re-file without re-paying (rmc).
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and to Set Briefing Schedule by General Motors LLC. (Holmer, Andrew).(jah).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Kathleen Taylor Sooy, re #11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/25/2019.(rmc)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-13074984.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sooy, Kathleen) (dsn)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Holmer on behalf of General Motors LLC (Holmer, Andrew). Attorney Andrew John Holmer added to party General Motors LLC (pty:dft). (jah).
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest and Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC. (Holmer, Andrew). (jah) (rmc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kendra Piazza, Percy Sutton, Lana Savage, Gladys Tubbs, Matt Goldstein, Rafael Martinez, Julian Wilder. General Motors LLC served. (Ozzello, Mark). (jah).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Amey J. Park, re #5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/23/2019.(dsn)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Russell D. Paul, re #4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/23/2019.(dsn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12966852.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Park, Amey)(jrd)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12966738.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Paul, Russell)(jrd)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Bernard G. Skomal to the calendar of the Honorable Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. All pending dates including discovery deadlines, hearings, and conferences before Judge Skomal, if any, remain unchanged until further order and are now set before Judge Goddard. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. The new case number is 19cv1778-H-AHG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/18/2019. (jah)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12948971.), filed by Kendra Piazza, Percy Sutton, Lana Savage, Gladys Tubbs, Matt Goldstein, Rafael Martinez, Julian Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Matt Goldstein in Support of Venue for Class Action Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01778-H-BGS. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Ozzello, Mark)(jmo) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldstein et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Wilder
Represented By: Mark Alan Ozzello
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Sutton
Represented By: Mark Alan Ozzello
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Martinez
Represented By: Mark Alan Ozzello
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Goldstein
Represented By: Mark Alan Ozzello
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Amey J Park
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Tubbs
Represented By: Mark Alan Ozzello
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Savage
Represented By: Mark Alan Ozzello
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Piazza
Represented By: Mark Alan Ozzello
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Represented By: Trisha K. Monesi
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Allyson Marie McKinstry
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?