Stross v. DapperToast, LLC
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Defendant: DapperToast, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01798
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 11/20/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 10/16/2019. (tcf)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by DapperToast, LLC.(Safarian, Aroutun)Attorney Aroutun Harry Safarian added to party DapperToast, LLC(pty:dft) (tcf).
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Bayonne Stross. DapperToast, LLC served. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (ag).
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alexander Bayonne Stross. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (tcf).
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1798-WQH-RBB.(no document attached) (mme)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DapperToast, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12957838.), filed by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Images, #3 Exhibit 2 - Registration, #4 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #5 Copyright Report)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01798-BEN-RBB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Grossbardt, Jonah)(jmo) Copyright Report mailed.(jmo). (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stross v. DapperToast, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DapperToast, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?