Roberts v. San Diego Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Tina Louise Roberts
Defendant: San Diego Police Department, Ida Cruz and Officer Cook 271
Case Number: 3:2019cv01806
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: John A Houston
2 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION Finding of Facts by Plaintiff Tina Louise Roberts. (jrm)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Accepting Document: Findings of Fact/Proof of Service, from Plaintiff Tina Louise Roberts. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.2 - Missing Proof of Service; Civ.L. Rule 5.1 - Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation;. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/13/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/14/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting Document: Proof of Service by First Class Mail - Civil, from Plaintiff Tina Louise Roberts. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: OTHER: LR 5.1 Improper format. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/05/2019.(jrm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (jrm).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting Document: Letter to Judge, from Plaintiff Tina Louise Roberts. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L. Rule 5.1 - Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation; LR83(9) Ex parte communication is prohibited, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/23/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (jrm).
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting Document: Case #19cv1806, from Plaintiff Tina Louise Roberts. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L. Rule 5.2 - Missing Proof of Service; Civ.L. Rule 5.1 - Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/17/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (jrm).
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge John A. Houston is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1806-AJB-NLS.(no document attached) (sxa)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Photographs, from Plaintiff Tina Louise Roberts. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Improper format, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/7/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (tcf).
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1806-JAH-NLS.(no document attached) (jmo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tina Louise Roberts. (jmo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tina Louise Roberts. (jmo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ida Cruz, Officer Cook 271, San Diego Police Department, IFP Filed, filed by Tina Louise Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01806-MMA-NLS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(jmo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. San Diego Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ida Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cook 271
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Louise Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?